This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 08/02/2020 at 16:50:44 (UTC).

HEALTHSOURCE FWB NORTH, LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF MICKY THOMPSON VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 HEALTHSOURCE FWB NORTH, LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF MICKY THOMPSON filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ARIAS, ROBERTO A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ARIAS, ROBERTO A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HEALTHSOURCE FWB NORTH, LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF MICKY THOMPSON

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Saben, Adam B

10245 Centurion Pkwy N Ste 109

Jacksonville, FL 32256-0569

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

6/25/2020- D13- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

4/27/2020- D9- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

4/2/2020- D8- PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

SUMMONS ISSUED - PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

2/21/2020- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED - PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

2/19/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

2/19/2020- D2- COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET - (CIVIL) - PLAINTIFF

2/19/2020- D1- COVER SHEET - (CIVIL) - PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3618638

2/21/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3618638

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/25/2020; > CANCEL REASON - DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/25/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 6/26/2020 9:00:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/25/2020; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 06/26/2020 9:00 AM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; > CANCEL REASON - RESCHEDULING DUE TO COVID-19 OR BK19179 PG1359

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 4/2/2020 1:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/2/2020; PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS; Assessed : $55.00; Paid : $55.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED - PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 04/02/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3618638

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $0 - $100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; COVER SHEET - (CIVIL) - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less