This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 01/28/2021 at 12:31:17 (UTC).

HALLY VILLANUEVA ACUNA VS CHAMPION BRANDS, INC. Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/30/2020 HALLY VILLANUEVA ACUNA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CHAMPION BRANDS, INC. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Roberson, Eric. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Roberson, Eric

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HALLY VILLANUEVA ACUNA

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendants

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

One State Farm Plaza

Bloomington, IL 61710

CHAMPION BRANDS, INC.

5571 Florida Mining Boulevard South

Jacksonville, FL 32257

TYLER JAMES BLANCHARD

Jacksonville, FL 32216

Not Classified By Court

Mediator

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Humphries, Jeffrey James

76 S Laura St Ste 1100

Jacksonville, FL 32202-5413

Defendant Attorney

Woodruff, James Joseph II

1120 20Th St Nw Frnt 9

Washington, DC 20036-3411

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Lucas, Brett Quincy

Attorney at Brett Q Lucas PA

6272 Dupont Station Ct E

Jacksonville, FL 32217-2567

Other Attorneys

Van Der Linde, Kristen Marie

201 N Hogan St Ste 400

Jacksonville, FL 32202-4220

 

Court Documents

CASE FEES PAID: $431.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3605514

1/31/2020- D7- CASE FEES PAID: $431.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3605514

COMPLAINT

1/30/2020- D2- COMPLAINT

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/18/2020 @140PM BY DEE GARVIN

2/19/2020- D18- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY ON 02/18/2020 @140PM BY DEE GARVIN

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JAMES WOODRUFF II FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

3/17/2020- D25- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JAMES WOODRUFF II FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

ORDER SETTING CASE FOR JURY TRIAL P/T 07/01/2021 @215PM RM 712

4/29/2020- D41- ORDER SETTING CASE FOR JURY TRIAL P/T 07/01/2021 @215PM RM 712

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2021
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:30 AM; Type : JURY TRIAL; Location : NO COURT ROOM ENTERED; Courtroom : 0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/29/2020; NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE OF CHAMPION BRANDS INC. (PLAINTIFF'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/29/2020; NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION OF TYLER JAMES BLANCHARD (PLAINTIFF'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/8/2020; NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT UPON DEFT TYLER JAMES BLANCHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/8/2020; NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT UPON DEFT CHAMPION BRANDS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/7/2020; REQUEST FOR COPIES (DEFTS.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/22/2020; SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (PLTF'S) ACCEPTANCE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/19/2020; NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE 12-16-20, 1:30PM, DUPOINT STATION COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/15/2020; REQUEST FOR COPIES -PLTF TO DEFTS', TYLER JAMES BLANCHARD AND CHAMPION BRANDS, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/15/2020; REQUEST FOR COPIES -PLTF TO DEFT, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO.

    Read MoreRead Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2020; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $431.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3605514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2020; AUTO NEGLIGENCE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO TYLER JAMES BLANCHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO CHAMPION BRANDS, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2020; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHAMPION BRANDS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Mediator is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Van Der Linde, Kristen Marie