Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 01/29/2021 at 03:34:42 (UTC).

GRETCHEN BAUER VS LONNIE BOWEN

Case Summary

On 03/13/2020 GRETCHEN BAUER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LONNIE BOWEN. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAY, LANCE M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAY, LANCE M.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GRETCHEN BAUER

Jacksonville, FL 32223

Respondent

LONNIE BOWEN

Jacksonville, FL 32277

Not Classified By Court

Mediator

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Sharpe-Kutz, Susan

2950 Halcyon Ln Ste 305

Jacksonville, FL 32223-6691

Respondent Attorney

Sacks, Adam Lee

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE of SACKS & Sacks, P.A.

1646 Emerson St Ste B

Jacksonville, FL 32207-6153

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Brice, Paula Preziosi

Po Box 380100

Jacksonville, FL 32205-0500

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING - 1-5-21 @ 1:30PM VIA ZOOM

10/23/2020- D39- NOTICE OF HEARING - 1-5-21 @ 1:30PM VIA ZOOM

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE - 01/12/21 AT 9:30AM - PAULA PREZIOSI BRICE, ESQ.

10/6/2020- D38- NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE - 01/12/21 AT 9:30AM - PAULA PREZIOSI BRICE, ESQ.

CORRESPONDENCE TO BAUMANN, JACQUELYN FROM DESIRE JORDAN

10/5/2020- D37- CORRESPONDENCE TO BAUMANN, JACQUELYN FROM DESIRE JORDAN

CERTIFICATION OF JURISDICTION HAVING BEEN ESTABLISHED THROUGH TESTIMONY IN ADVANCE OF FINAL HEARING IN DISSOLUTION MATTERS - JUDGE LANCE M. DAY

10/2/2020- D36- CERTIFICATION OF JURISDICTION HAVING BEEN ESTABLISHED THROUGH TESTIMONY IN ADVANCE OF FINAL HEARING IN DISSOLUTION MATTERS - JUDGE LANCE M. DAY

ORDER FALLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/2/2020- D35- ORDER FALLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

MAGISTRATE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION REGARDING OBJECTION TO REFERRAL TO THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE

8/24/2020- D34- MAGISTRATE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION REGARDING OBJECTION TO REFERRAL TO THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE

ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 9/22/2020 AT 2:00P VIA ZOOM

8/14/2020- D33- ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 9/22/2020 AT 2:00P VIA ZOOM

ORDER OF REFERRAL TO FAMILY MEDIATION UNIT

8/6/2020- D30- ORDER OF REFERRAL TO FAMILY MEDIATION UNIT

ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE -JAMIE L. IBRAHIM

8/6/2020- D29- ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE -JAMIE L. IBRAHIM

ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL

8/4/2020- D28- ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL

ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION APPOINTS PAULA PREZIOSI BRICE

6/12/2020- D22- ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION APPOINTS PAULA PREZIOSI BRICE

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 05/26/2020 1:30PM MAGISTRATE FRANK AKEL VIA ZOOM

5/19/2020- D19- NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 05/26/2020 1:30PM MAGISTRATE FRANK AKEL VIA ZOOM

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ADAM SACKS FOR LONNIE BOWEN AND DESIGNATION OF E MAIL

4/15/2020- D16- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ADAM SACKS FOR LONNIE BOWEN AND DESIGNATION OF E MAIL

MOTION FOR TEMPORARY NEEDS AND FACULTIES AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED HEARING/GRETCHEN BAUER/ATTY

4/9/2020- D14- MOTION FOR TEMPORARY NEEDS AND FACULTIES AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED HEARING/GRETCHEN BAUER/ATTY

COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE/GRETCHEN BAUER/ATTY

3/13/2020- D2- COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE/GRETCHEN BAUER/ATTY

CASE FEES PAID: $419.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3638689

3/13/2020- D13- CASE FEES PAID: $419.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3638689

STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

3/13/2020- D3- STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketEntered: 1/8/2021; DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE -CANCELED BY PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketEntered: 1/8/2021; CORRESPONDENCE TO BAUMANN, JACQUELYN FROM DESIRE JORDAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketEntered: 1/8/2021; ORDER ON WIFE'S MTN TO COMPEL & REQUEST FOR ATTY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketEntered: 12/31/2020; NOTICE OF FILING CERTIFICATE OF ATTORNEY AS TO TIME SPENT/ GRETCHEN BAUER/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • DocketEntered: 11/13/2020; NOTICE OF HEARING (AMENDED) 01/05/2021 1:30 PM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/23/2020; NOTICE OF HEARING - 1-5-21 @ 1:30PM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/9/2020; NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE - 01/12/21 AT 9:30AM - PAULA PREZIOSI BRICE, ESQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/5/2020; CORRESPONDENCE TO BAUMANN, JACQUELYN FROM DESIRE JORDAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/5/2020; CERTIFICATION OF JURISDICTION HAVING BEEN ESTABLISHED THROUGH TESTIMONY IN ADVANCE OF FINAL HEARING IN DISSOLUTION MATTERS - JUDGE LANCE M. DAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/5/2020; ORDER FALLOWING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO: LONNIE BOWEN FROM: GRETCHEN BAUER/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER GRETCHEN BAUER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT GRETCHEN BAUER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; NOTICE OF RELATED CASES NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE/GRETCHEN BAUER/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mediator is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brice, Paula Preziosi