This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 08/23/2020 at 00:53:27 (UTC).

GRANITE NORMANDY ESTATES, LLC VS GEORGE WEST

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 GRANITE NORMANDY ESTATES, LLC filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against GEORGE WEST. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUTH, JAMES A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUTH, JAMES A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GRANITE NORMANDY ESTATES, LLC

2946 E. Commercial Blvd.

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33308

Defendant

GEORGE WEST

Jacksonville, FL 32221

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hochberg, Carolyn

2946 E Commercial Blvd

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33308-4208

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE :PLAINTIFF

2/25/2020- D9- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE :PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO GEORGE WEST ON 02/20/20 @12:35PM, POSTED

2/25/2020- D8- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO GEORGE WEST ON 02/20/20 @12:35PM, POSTED

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS ENTERED UPON GEORGE WEST

2/13/2020- D7- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS ENTERED UPON GEORGE WEST

COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT FOR MOBILE HOME PARK(NON-PAYMENT OF LOT RENT)

2/12/2020- D4- COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT FOR MOBILE HOME PARK(NON-PAYMENT OF LOT RENT)

SUMMONS ISSUED GEORGE WEST

2/12/2020- D2- SUMMONS ISSUED GEORGE WEST

COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S (CIVIL)

2/12/2020- D1- COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S (CIVIL)

CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3614554

2/13/2020- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3614554

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING GEORGE WEST

2/12/2020- D3- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING GEORGE WEST

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/27/2020; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE :PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO GEORGE WEST ON 02/20/20 @12:35PM, POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed : $3.50; Paid : $3.50; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/13/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS ENTERED UPON GEORGE WEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/13/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3614554

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/13/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/13/2020; COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT FOR MOBILE HOME PARK(NON-PAYMENT OF LOT RENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/13/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING GEORGE WEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/13/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED GEORGE WEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/13/2020; COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S (CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less