Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/28/2021 at 20:58:34 (UTC).

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY VS PRIME CLAIMS SERVICE A/K/A PRIME HOLDINGS INSURANCE SERVICES INC

Case Summary

On 02/05/2020 GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PRIME CLAIMS SERVICE A/K/A PRIME HOLDINGS INSURANCE SERVICES INC. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUTH, JAMES A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUTH, JAMES A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

P.O. Box 550858

Jacksonville, FL 32255-0858

Defendant

PRIME CLAIMS SERVICE A/K/A PRIME HOLDINGS INSURANCE SERVICES INC

P.O. Box 4439

Sandy, UT 84091

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Reiss, Jennifer L

Po Box 550858

Jacksonville, FL 32255-0858

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

10/30/2020- D21- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE :PLAINTIFF

10/8/2020- D18- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE :PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING ON OCTOBER 13,2020 AT 11:15 AM :PLAINTIFF

10/8/2020- D17- NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING ON OCTOBER 13,2020 AT 11:15 AM :PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF HEARING (AMENDED)ON OCTOBER 13, 2020 AT 11:15 AM

9/28/2020- D15- NOTICE OF HEARING (AMENDED)ON OCTOBER 13, 2020 AT 11:15 AM

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 7/16/20 @12:35 PM SERVED-CORPORATE CARSON FINAN

8/11/2020- D14- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 7/16/20 @12:35 PM SERVED-CORPORATE CARSON FINAN

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 7/20/20 @2:46 PM SERVED-CORPORATE DONNA MOCH

8/11/2020- D13- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 7/20/20 @2:46 PM SERVED-CORPORATE DONNA MOCH

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 7/20/2020 @2:46 PM SERVED-CORPORATE DONNA MOCH

7/21/2020- D12- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 7/20/2020 @2:46 PM SERVED-CORPORATE DONNA MOCH

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 7/16/2020 @12:35 PM SERVED-CORPORATE CARSON FINAN

7/17/2020- D11- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 7/16/2020 @12:35 PM SERVED-CORPORATE CARSON FINAN

NOTICE OF HEARING 10/13/2020 @11:15 AM HR 723

6/17/2020- D9- NOTICE OF HEARING 10/13/2020 @11:15 AM HR 723

AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF OF AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES

2/6/2020- D4- AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF OF AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES

NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS FROM PLAINTIFF

2/5/2020- D6- NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS FROM PLAINTIFF

AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES (PLAINTIFF'S)

2/5/2020- D3- AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES (PLAINTIFF'S)

PETITION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING ARBITRATION DECISION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT AND FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

2/5/2020- D2- PETITION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING ARBITRATION DECISION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT AND FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

COVER SHEET (PLAINTIFF'S)

2/5/2020- D1- COVER SHEET (PLAINTIFF'S)

CASE FEES PAID: $300.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3609626

2/5/2020- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $300.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3609626

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JENNIFER REISS FOR GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY (PLAINTIFF'S)

2/5/2020- D5- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JENNIFER REISS FOR GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY (PLAINTIFF'S)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/30/2020; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 11:15 AM; Type : NOTICE OF HEARING; Location : CHAMBERS; Courtroom : 723;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/9/2020; > CANCEL REASON - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING FILED BY PLTF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/9/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE OF HEARING ON 10/13/2020 11:15:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/9/2020; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE :PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/9/2020; NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING ON OCTOBER 13,2020 AT 11:15 AM :PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/30/2020; NOTICE OF HEARING ON 10-13-2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/30/2020; NOTICE OF HEARING (AMENDED)ON OCTOBER 13, 2020 AT 11:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/11/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 7/16/20 @12:35 PM SERVED-CORPORATE CARSON FINAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/11/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 7/20/20 @2:46 PM SERVED-CORPORATE DONNA MOCH

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/18/2020; NOTICE OF HEARING 10/13/2020 @11:15 AM HR 723

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS >$2500 <=$15,000 1/1/2020; Assessed : $300.00; Paid : $300.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/6/2020; AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF OF AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/6/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $300.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3609626

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/6/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $8000 - $15000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/6/2020; NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS FROM PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/6/2020; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JENNIFER REISS FOR GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY (PLAINTIFF'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/6/2020; AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES (PLAINTIFF'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/6/2020; PETITION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING ARBITRATION DECISION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT AND FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/6/2020; COVER SHEET (PLAINTIFF'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Government Employees Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REISS JENNIFER L