Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/28/2021 at 23:35:35 (UTC).

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF CHRIS ANTHONY MAY VS TERESA PICKETT Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF CHRIS ANTHONY MAY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TERESA PICKETT. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PERRY, ERIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PERRY, ERIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF CHRIS ANTHONY MAY

4100-3 Southpoint, Drive E

Jacksonville, FL 32216

Defendants

TERESA PICKETT

Jacksonville, FL 32244

TIERRA DAUZANE BROOKS

Jacksonville, FL 32244

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Reiss, Jennifer L

Po Box 550858

Jacksonville, FL 32255-0858

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISMISSAL

11/4/2020- D27- ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISMISSAL

STIPULATION - BOTH PARTIES

10/26/2020- D26- STIPULATION - BOTH PARTIES

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ALIAS, 09/16/2020 09:24AM SUBSTITUTE, TERESA PICKETT FOR TIERRA BROOKS, TERESA PICKETT

9/23/2020- D25- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ALIAS, 09/16/2020 09:24AM SUBSTITUTE, TERESA PICKETT FOR TIERRA BROOKS, TERESA PICKETT

OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE -OTHER-DEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR FOR MEDIATION

8/17/2020- D24- OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE -OTHER-DEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR FOR MEDIATION

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE - 8/17/2020 @ 4:00PM

6/19/2020- D23- NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE - 8/17/2020 @ 4:00PM

SUMMONS ISSUED -(ALIAS) TIERRA DAUZANE BROOKS-6075 MAGGIE CIRCLE UNIT 104

6/11/2020- D21- SUMMONS ISSUED -(ALIAS) TIERRA DAUZANE BROOKS-6075 MAGGIE CIRCLE UNIT 104

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (TIERRA DAUZANE BROOKS) ALIAS - PLAINTIFF

4/24/2020- D18- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (TIERRA DAUZANE BROOKS) ALIAS - PLAINTIFF

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

4/27/2020- D17- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON SUMMONS 03/17/2020 @ 5:36PM TIERRA DAUZANE BROOKS, TERESA PICKETT

3/20/2020- D16- SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON SUMMONS 03/17/2020 @ 5:36PM TIERRA DAUZANE BROOKS, TERESA PICKETT

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

3/18/2020- D15- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 02/26/2020 @ 8:14PM PERSONAL TO TERESA PICKETT

2/28/2020- D11- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 02/26/2020 @ 8:14PM PERSONAL TO TERESA PICKETT

SUMMONS ISSUED TERESA PICKETT

2/13/2020- D10- SUMMONS ISSUED TERESA PICKETT

SUMMONS ISSUED TIERRA DAUZANE BROOKS

2/13/2020- D9- SUMMONS ISSUED TIERRA DAUZANE BROOKS

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TERESA PICKETT, PLAINTIFF'S

2/12/2020- D5- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TERESA PICKETT, PLAINTIFF'S

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TIERRA DAUZANE BROOKS, PLAINTIFF'S

2/12/2020- D4- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TIERRA DAUZANE BROOKS, PLAINTIFF'S

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS FROM PLAINTIFF

2/12/2020- D3- DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS FROM PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S

2/12/2020- D1- COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S

STATEMENT OF CLAIM PLAINTIFF'S

2/12/2020- D2- STATEMENT OF CLAIM PLAINTIFF'S

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/6/2020; ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/28/2020; STIPULATION - BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/23/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ALIAS, 09/16/2020 09:24AM SUBSTITUTE, TERESA PICKETT FOR TIERRA BROOKS, TERESA PICKETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/18/2020; OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE -OTHER-DEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR FOR MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/22/2020; NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE - 8/17/2020 @ 4:00PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/11/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED -(ALIAS) TIERRA DAUZANE BROOKS-6075 MAGGIE CIRCLE UNIT 104

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketEntered: 5/7/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3661462

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/13/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TERESA PICKETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/13/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TIERRA DAUZANE BROOKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/13/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 03/26/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/13/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $320.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3614532

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/13/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $5001 - $8000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/13/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TERESA PICKETT, PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/13/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED TIERRA DAUZANE BROOKS, PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/13/2020; DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS FROM PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/13/2020; COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/13/2020; STATEMENT OF CLAIM PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Government Employees Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer REISS JENNIFER L