This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 09/11/2020 at 00:33:58 (UTC).

GOLDOLLER LLC FOR THE AVENUES VS DELPHINE HAMILTON Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 GOLDOLLER LLC FOR THE AVENUES filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against DELPHINE HAMILTON. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FERGUSON, III, EMMET F.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FERGUSON, III, EMMET F.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOLDOLLER LLC FOR THE AVENUES

C/O Dale G. Westling, Sr., Esquire 331 E Union St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendants

DELPHINE HAMILTON

Jacksonville, FL 32256

TIDERE HAMILTON

Jacksonville, FL 32256

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Westling, Dale Gregory

331 Union St E Ste 2A

Jacksonville, FL 32202-2795

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE -FILED BY PLTF.

7/13/2020- D22- NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE -FILED BY PLTF.

COPY OF MAILED SUMMONS & COMPLAINT RETURNED NOT DELIVERED FOR DELPHINE HAMILTON

2/28/2020- D21- COPY OF MAILED SUMMONS & COMPLAINT RETURNED NOT DELIVERED FOR DELPHINE HAMILTON

COPY OF MAILED SUMMONS & COMPLAINT RETURNED NOT DELIVERED FOR TIDERE HAMILTON

2/28/2020- D20- COPY OF MAILED SUMMONS & COMPLAINT RETURNED NOT DELIVERED FOR TIDERE HAMILTON

MEMO TO DISBURSE FUNDS OF $2,843.92 TO: THE AVENUES C/O DALE G. WESTLING, SR. ESQ. 331 EAST UNION STREET JACKSONVILLE, FL 32202 (BAL 0.00)

2/26/2020- D19- MEMO TO DISBURSE FUNDS OF $2,843.92 TO: THE AVENUES C/O DALE G. WESTLING, SR. ESQ. 331 EAST UNION STREET JACKSONVILLE, FL 32202 (BAL 0.00)

ORDER AUTHORIZING DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS TO PLAINTIFF

2/25/2020- D18- ORDER AUTHORIZING DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS TO PLAINTIFF

STIPULATION OF PAYMENTS SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES

2/19/2020- D16- STIPULATION OF PAYMENTS SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES

MEMORANDUM TO CASHIER RENT FOR DEC. 2019 & JAN. 2020 $2,843.92 CL. $50.16

2/12/2020- D15- MEMORANDUM TO CASHIER RENT FOR DEC. 2019 & JAN. 2020 $2,843.92 CL. $50.16

CASE FEES PAID: $2,894.08 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3613491

2/12/2020- D14- CASE FEES PAID: $2,894.08 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3613491

ANSWER SUBMIT BY DEFENDANT HAMILTON DELPHINE

2/12/2020- D13- ANSWER SUBMIT BY DEFENDANT HAMILTON DELPHINE

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TIDERE HAMILTON ON FEB. 8, 2020 AT 1:40 PM POSTED.

2/10/2020- D12- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TIDERE HAMILTON ON FEB. 8, 2020 AT 1:40 PM POSTED.

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS

2/4/2020- D10- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DELPHINE HAMILTON

2/4/2020- D9- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DELPHINE HAMILTON

CASE FEES PAID: $212.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3608359

2/4/2020- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $212.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3608359

COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

2/3/2020- D6- COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

SUMMONS ISSUED TIDERE HAMILTON

2/3/2020- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED TIDERE HAMILTON

SUMMONS ISSUED DELPHINE HAMILTON

2/3/2020- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED DELPHINE HAMILTON

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING DELPHINE HAMILTON

2/3/2020- D2- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING DELPHINE HAMILTON

COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S (CIVIL)

2/3/2020- D1- COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S (CIVIL)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/13/2020; NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE -FILED BY PLTF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2020; COPY OF MAILED SUMMONS & COMPLAINT RETURNED NOT DELIVERED FOR DELPHINE HAMILTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2020; COPY OF MAILED SUMMONS & COMPLAINT RETURNED NOT DELIVERED FOR TIDERE HAMILTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; MEMO TO DISBURSE FUNDS OF $2,843.92 TO: THE AVENUES C/O DALE G. WESTLING, SR. ESQ. 331 EAST UNION STREET JACKSONVILLE, FL 32202 (BAL 0.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; ORDER AUTHORIZING DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF REGISTRY FUNDS - FILED BY PLNTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; STIPULATION OF PAYMENTS SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REGISTRY/GENCIV; Assessed : $2,894.08; Paid : $2,894.08; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/12/2020; MEMORANDUM TO CASHIER RENT FOR DEC. 2019 & JAN. 2020 $2,843.92 CL. $50.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/12/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $2,894.08 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3613491

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DELPHINE HAMILTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $212.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3608359

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TIDERE HAMILTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED DELPHINE HAMILTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TIDERE HAMILTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING DELPHINE HAMILTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S (CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less