This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/28/2021 at 17:43:38 (UTC).

GILMORE CHIROPRACTIC, P.A. AS ASSIGNEE OF LINDSAY THOMPSON VS ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/28/2020 GILMORE CHIROPRACTIC, P A AS ASSIGNEE OF LINDSAY THOMPSON filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DRAKE, PAULINE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DRAKE, PAULINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GILMORE CHIROPRACTIC, P.A. AS ASSIGNEE OF LINDSAY THOMPSON

Jacksonville, FL 32256

Defendant

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E.Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Saben, Adam B

10245 Centurion Pkwy N Ste 109

Jacksonville, FL 32256-0569

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

12/22/2020- D11- ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED DELIVERED

11/19/2020- D10- MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED DELIVERED

SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT -THERE IS NO RETURN OF SERVICE ON FILE.

3/12/2020- D8- SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT -THERE IS NO RETURN OF SERVICE ON FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

1/28/2020- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY :PLAINTIFF

1/28/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY :PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT :PLAINTIFF

1/28/2020- D2- COMPLAINT :PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET :PLAINTIFF

1/28/2020- D1- COVER SHEET :PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3603387

1/28/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3603387

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/23/2020; ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/24/2020; MAIL RECEIPT RETURNED DELIVERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; NOTICE OF PROPOSED DISMISSAL ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/13/2020; SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE STATUS REPORT -THERE IS NO RETURN OF SERVICE ON FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS; Assessed : $55.00; Paid : $55.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 03/12/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3603387

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $0 - $100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY :PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; COMPLAINT :PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; COVER SHEET :PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Saben, Adam B