This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 09/05/2020 at 00:32:17 (UTC).

G&I VII WESTLAND PARK LLC VS JAMESHA HOSEA Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 G I VII WESTLAND PARK LLC filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against JAMESHA HOSEA. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ARIAS, ROBERTO A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ARIAS, ROBERTO A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

G&I VII WESTLAND PARK LLC

Po Box 62884

Ft. Myers, FL 33906

Defendants

JAMESHA HOSEA

Jacksonville, FL 32244

TA'REIKA LARKINS

Jacksonville, FL 32244

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wolk, Brian Peter

Attorney at Heist, Weisse & Wolk P.A.

5246 Clayton Ct

Fort Myers, FL 33907-2116

 

Court Documents

RETURNED MAIL-UNDELIVERABLE

8/11/2020- D17- RETURNED MAIL-UNDELIVERABLE

ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING EVICTIONS FOR NON-PAYMENT AND REQUIRING FURTHER PLEADING FROM PLAINTIFF

6/15/2020- D16- ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING EVICTIONS FOR NON-PAYMENT AND REQUIRING FURTHER PLEADING FROM PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE :PLAINTIFF

6/15/2020- D15- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE :PLAINTIFF

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT -AS TO DEFT JAMESHA HOSEA AND TA'REIKA LARKINS

3/3/2020- D14- NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT -AS TO DEFT JAMESHA HOSEA AND TA'REIKA LARKINS

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE POSTED ON 02/25/2020 @ 1:50PM AS TO DEFT TA'REIKA LARKINS

3/3/2020- D13- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE POSTED ON 02/25/2020 @ 1:50PM AS TO DEFT TA'REIKA LARKINS

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE POSTED ON 02/25/2020 @ 1:50PM AS TO DEFT JAMESHA HOSEA

3/3/2020- D12- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE POSTED ON 02/25/2020 @ 1:50PM AS TO DEFT JAMESHA HOSEA

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS BRIAN P WOLK, AS ATTORNEY FOR G&I VII WESTLAND PARK, LLC

2/20/2020- D11- DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS BRIAN P WOLK, AS ATTORNEY FOR G&I VII WESTLAND PARK, LLC

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO JAMESHA HOSEA

2/19/2020- D9- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO JAMESHA HOSEA

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO TA'REIKA LARKINS

2/19/2020- D10- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO TA'REIKA LARKINS

CASE FEES PAID: $212.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3617351

2/18/2020- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $212.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3617351

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR TA'REIKA LARKINS

2/18/2020- D6- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR TA'REIKA LARKINS

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR TA'REIKA LARKINS

2/18/2020- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED FOR TA'REIKA LARKINS

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR JAMESHA HOSEA

2/18/2020- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED FOR JAMESHA HOSEA

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR JAMESHA HOSEA

2/18/2020- D3- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR JAMESHA HOSEA

COMPLAINT (FOR TENANT EVICTION)

2/18/2020- D2- COMPLAINT (FOR TENANT EVICTION)

COVER SHEET

2/18/2020- D1- COVER SHEET

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/11/2020; RETURNED MAIL-UNDELIVERABLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/16/2020; ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING EVICTIONS FOR NON-PAYMENT AND REQUIRING FURTHER PLEADING FROM PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/16/2020; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE :PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/4/2020; NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT -AS TO DEFT JAMESHA HOSEA AND TA'REIKA LARKINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/4/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE POSTED ON 02/25/2020 @ 1:50PM AS TO DEFT TA'REIKA LARKINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/4/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE POSTED ON 02/25/2020 @ 1:50PM AS TO DEFT JAMESHA HOSEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS BRIAN P WOLK, AS ATTORNEY FOR G&I VII WESTLAND PARK, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed : $3.50; Paid : $3.50; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO JAMESHA HOSEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO TA'REIKA LARKINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $212.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3617351

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR TA'REIKA LARKINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED FOR TA'REIKA LARKINS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED FOR JAMESHA HOSEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR JAMESHA HOSEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; COMPLAINT (FOR TENANT EVICTION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less