This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 08/12/2020 at 03:30:34 (UTC).

FLORIDA LAND TRUST 1728 W 31ST ST VS MARKEES PEEK

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 FLORIDA LAND TRUST 1728 W 31ST ST filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against MARKEES PEEK. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FLOWER, GARY P.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FLOWER, GARY P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FLORIDA LAND TRUST 1728 W 31ST ST

7749 Normandy Blvd #145 - 340

Jacksonville, FL 32221

Defendants

MARKEES PEEK

Jacksonville, FL 32209

Unknown Tenant

Jacksonville, FL 32209

 

Court Documents

ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING EVICTIONS FOR NON PAYMENT AND REQUIRING FURTHER PLEADING FROM PLAINTIFF

5/6/2020- D15- ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING EVICTIONS FOR NON PAYMENT AND REQUIRING FURTHER PLEADING FROM PLAINTIFF

ANSWER SUBMITTED BY DEFENDANT MARKEES PEEK

3/3/2020- D14- ANSWER SUBMITTED BY DEFENDANT MARKEES PEEK

DEFAULT AS TO MARKEES PECK AND UNKNOWN TENANT

2/26/2020- D13- DEFAULT AS TO MARKEES PECK AND UNKNOWN TENANT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AS TO MARKEES PECK AND UNKNOWN TENANT

2/26/2020- D12- MOTION FOR DEFAULT AS TO MARKEES PECK AND UNKNOWN TENANT

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT (DEFAULT) AS TO MARKEES PECK AND UNKNOWN TENANT

2/26/2020- D11- MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT (DEFAULT) AS TO MARKEES PECK AND UNKNOWN TENANT

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AS TO MARKEES PECK

2/26/2020- D10- NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AS TO MARKEES PECK

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON UNKNOWN TENANT; SUBSTITUTE SERVED ON 2/18/20 @ 6PM BY BOBBY PECK

2/26/2020- D9- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON UNKNOWN TENANT; SUBSTITUTE SERVED ON 2/18/20 @ 6PM BY BOBBY PECK

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON MARKEES PECK; SUBSTITUTE SERVED ON 2/18/20 @ 6PM BY BOBBY PECK

2/26/2020- D8- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON MARKEES PECK; SUBSTITUTE SERVED ON 2/18/20 @ 6PM BY BOBBY PECK

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS

2/18/2020- D7- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS

COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

2/18/2020- D6- COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

COVER SHEET

2/18/2020- D5- COVER SHEET

CASE FEES PAID: $205.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3616634

2/18/2020- D4- CASE FEES PAID: $205.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3616634

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT

2/18/2020- D3- SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT

SUMMONS ISSUED MARKEES PECK

2/18/2020- D2- SUMMONS ISSUED MARKEES PECK

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/8/2020; ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING EVICTIONS FOR NON PAYMENT AND REQUIRING FURTHER PLEADING FROM PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/3/2020; ANSWER SUBMITTED BY DEFENDANT MARKEES PEEK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; DEFAULT AS TO MARKEES PECK AND UNKNOWN TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; MOTION FOR DEFAULT AS TO MARKEES PECK AND UNKNOWN TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT (DEFAULT) AS TO MARKEES PECK AND UNKNOWN TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AS TO MARKEES PECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON UNKNOWN TENANT; SUBSTITUTE SERVED ON 2/18/20 @ 6PM BY BOBBY PECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON MARKEES PECK; SUBSTITUTE SERVED ON 2/18/20 @ 6PM BY BOBBY PECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/18/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/18/2020; COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/18/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/18/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $205.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3616634

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/18/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/18/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED MARKEES PECK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/18/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less