This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 08/30/2020 at 00:03:51 (UTC).

ELEMENTS ACQUISITION LLC DBA THE ELEMENTS OF BELLE RIVE APTS VS KEEVIN AUSTIN SMITH

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 ELEMENTS ACQUISITION LLC DBA THE ELEMENTS OF BELLE RIVE APTS filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against KEEVIN AUSTIN SMITH. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BATEH, MICHAEL I. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BATEH, MICHAEL I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELEMENTS ACQUISITION LLC DBA THE ELEMENTS OF BELLE RIVE APTS

2720 Park Street Suite 219

Jacksonville, FL 32205

Defendant

KEEVIN AUSTIN SMITH

Jacksonville, FL 32256

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ritchie, Mitchell Sellers

Attorney at Mitchell S. Ritchie, P.A.

2720 Park St Ste 219

Jacksonville, FL 32205-7645

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

2/25/2020- D8- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFT KEEVIN AUSTIN SMITH

2/19/2020- D7- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFT KEEVIN AUSTIN SMITH

SUMMONS ISSUED KEEVIN AUSTIN SMITH

2/18/2020- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED KEEVIN AUSTIN SMITH

COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

2/18/2020- D3- COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING KEEVIN AUSTIN SMITH

2/18/2020- D2- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING KEEVIN AUSTIN SMITH

COVER SHEET

2/18/2020- D1- COVER SHEET

CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3616911

2/14/2020- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3616911

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed : $3.50; Paid : $3.50; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFT KEEVIN AUSTIN SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED KEEVIN AUSTIN SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING KEEVIN AUSTIN SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3616911

    Read MoreRead Less