This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 05/31/2020 at 18:08:34 (UTC).

DYNAMIC PAIN & WELLNESS, PLLC AS ASSIGNEE OF MICHAEL D DENSON VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/30/2020 DYNAMIC PAIN WELLNESS, PLLC AS ASSIGNEE OF MICHAEL D DENSON filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SADLER, KIMBERLY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SADLER, KIMBERLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DYNAMIC PAIN & WELLNESS, PLLC AS ASSIGNEE OF MICHAEL D DENSON

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Saben, Adam B

10245 Centurion Pkwy N Ste 109

Jacksonville, FL 32256-0569

Defendant Attorney

Satin, Jacob Michael

250 S Orange Ave Ste 600

Orlando, FL 32801-3443

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT (DEFENDANT'S)

5/12/2020- D20- NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT (DEFENDANT'S)

NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

4/24/2020- D19- NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT

4/24/2020- D18- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT

4/24/2020- D17- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT

ANSWER -DEFENDANT

4/1/2020- D15- ANSWER -DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS LAW FIRM OF MIMI L SMITH NEW ADDRESS 390 N ORANGE AVE, #1700, ORLANDO, FL, 32801

3/18/2020- D14- NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS LAW FIRM OF MIMI L SMITH NEW ADDRESS 390 N ORANGE AVE, #1700, ORLANDO, FL, 32801

ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

3/12/2020- D13- ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

STIPULATION (JOINT) OF WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

3/11/2020- D9- STIPULATION (JOINT) OF WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JACOB SATIN FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL FOR DEFENDANT

3/12/2020- D12- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JACOB SATIN FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL FOR DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ON 02/04/20 FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, ELECTRONICALLY DELIVERED TO LYNETTE COLEMAN

3/11/2020- D8- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ON 02/04/20 FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, ELECTRONICALLY DELIVERED TO LYNETTE COLEMAN

SUMMONS ISSUED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

1/31/2020- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, PLAINTIFF'S

1/30/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, PLAINTIFF'S

COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S

1/30/2020- D1- COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S

COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF'S

1/30/2020- D2- COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF'S

CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3605942

1/31/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3605942

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/13/2020; NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT (DEFENDANT'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/22/2020; REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (PLAINTIFF'S) DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/3/2020; ANSWER -DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/19/2020; NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS LAW FIRM OF MIMI L SMITH NEW ADDRESS 390 N ORANGE AVE, #1700, ORLANDO, FL, 32801

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/16/2020; ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/13/2020; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JACOB SATIN FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL FOR DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/11/2020; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ON 02/04/20 FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, ELECTRONICALLY DELIVERED TO LYNETTE COLEMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS>$500/=; Assessed : $175.00; Paid : $175.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 03/12/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3605942

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $501 - $2,500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2020; COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/31/2020; COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less