This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 05/13/2021 at 00:07:08 (UTC).

DUSTAN M. SCOTT VS AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/13/2020 DUSTAN M SCOTT filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Anderson Jr, Bruce R. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Anderson Jr, Bruce R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUSTAN M. SCOTT

Tampa, FL 33625

Defendants

KB HOME JACKSONVILLE LLC

C/O Corporation Service Company 1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

PEDEL PAINTING INC

C/O Jose E. Pedraza 730 Gingermill Road

Jacksonville, FL 32259

AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC

C/O Dominique Griffin 326 Fern Street

San Mateo, FL 32187

INNOVATIVE CONSTRUCTION GROUP, LLC

C/O Corporation Service Company 1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Not Yet Classified

PETERSEN DEAN ROOFING AND SOLAR SYSTEMS INC

3874 Fiscal Court Suite 400A

Riviera Beach, FL 33404

BUILDERS FIRSTSOURCE-FLORIDA LLC

Co - Ct Corporation 1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wilson, Matthew Lloyd George

6507 Gunn Hwy

Tampa, FL 33625-4021

Defendant Attorneys

Heckert, Katherine Lee

4221 W Boy Scout Blvd Ste 1000

Tampa, FL 33607-5780

Anderson, Denise M

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 2300

Tampa, FL 33602-4305

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE OF AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA,INC ON OCTOBER 19 2020 @ 01"29 PM

11/5/2020- D28- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE OF AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA,INC ON OCTOBER 19 2020 @ 01"29 PM

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON PEDEL PAINTING,INC/ON SEPTEMBER 25 2020 @ 01;08 PM

10/13/2020- D27- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON PEDEL PAINTING,INC/ON SEPTEMBER 25 2020 @ 01;08 PM

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON AMERICA LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC CO DOMINIQUE GRIFFIN ON 08/25/2020 @350PM

9/30/2020- D22- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON AMERICA LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC CO DOMINIQUE GRIFFIN ON 08/25/2020 @350PM

CASE FEES PAID: $20.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3717773

9/16/2020- D20- CASE FEES PAID: $20.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3717773

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DENISE ANDERSON FOR AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC (DEFT/CROSS-CLAIM DEFTS AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC)

8/26/2020- D16- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DENISE ANDERSON FOR AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC (DEFT/CROSS-CLAIM DEFTS AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC)

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON PEDEL PAINTING INC 07/29/2020 @1130AM BY DIEGO AMARILLO

8/24/2020- D15- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON PEDEL PAINTING INC 07/29/2020 @1130AM BY DIEGO AMARILLO

CASE FEES PAID: $397.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3701393

8/18/2020- D14- CASE FEES PAID: $397.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3701393

THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT (KB HOME JACKSONVILLE LLC ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND)

8/17/2020- D13- THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT (KB HOME JACKSONVILLE LLC ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND)

RETURN OF SERVICE - KANEISHA GROSS FOR INNOVATIVE CONSTRUCTION GROUP, LLC,, 07-27-20, 11:20AM

7/29/2020- D12- RETURN OF SERVICE - KANEISHA GROSS FOR INNOVATIVE CONSTRUCTION GROUP, LLC,, 07-27-20, 11:20AM

RETURN OF SERVICE - KANEISHA GROSS FOR KB HOME JACKSONVILLE LLC, 07-27-20, 11:20 AM

7/29/2020- D11- RETURN OF SERVICE - KANEISHA GROSS FOR KB HOME JACKSONVILLE LLC, 07-27-20, 11:20 AM

SUMMONS ISSUED TO AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC

7/14/2020- D10- SUMMONS ISSUED TO AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

7/14/2020- D2- COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

CASE FEES PAID: $441.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3686268

7/14/2020- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $441.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3686268

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketEntered: 5/12/2021; NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 07/29/2021 @930AM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketEntered: 4/7/2021; NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF FRANK T. MOYA AS COUNSEL FOR KB HOME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/5/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE OF AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA,INC ON OCTOBER 19 2020 @ 01"29 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/14/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON PEDEL PAINTING,INC/ON SEPTEMBER 25 2020 @ 01;08 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2020; PRIVILEGE LOG (DEFT/CROSS-CLAIM DEFT AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2020; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT/CROSS-CLAIM DEFT'S AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC'S) TO PLTF'S FIRST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2020; RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFT/CROSS-CLAIM DEFT'S AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC'S) TO PLTF'S FIRST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/13/2020; NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (DEFT/CROSS-CLAIM DEFT'S AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC'S) TO PLTF'S FIRST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/1/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON AMERICA LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC CO DOMINIQUE GRIFFIN ON 08/25/2020 @350PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/24/2020; ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER WITH REGARD TO SERVICE ON AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA, INC.-CHRISTINE TELEGA , WITH SERVE LEGAL PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/14/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO AMERICAN LATHING OF NORTH FLORIDA INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/14/2020; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/14/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $441.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3686268

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/14/2020; COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/14/2020; OTHER NEGLIGENCE - CONSTRUCTION DEFECT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/14/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO PEDEL PAINTING INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/14/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO KB HOME JACKSONVILLE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/14/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO INNOVATIVE CONSTRUCTION GROUP LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/14/2020; UNABLE TO ISSUE MADE ATTORNEY AWARE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/14/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INNOVATIVE CONSTRUCTION GROUP LLC DBA is a litigant

Latest cases where PETERSEN DEAN ROOFING & SOLAR SYSTEMS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where American Lathing Of North Florida Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Pedal Painting Inc is a litigant