Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 01/28/2021 at 22:04:43 (UTC).

DONNA L PORTER VS RICHARD E WALKER

Case Summary

On 03/05/2020 DONNA L PORTER filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against RICHARD E WALKER. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOYER, TYRIE W.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOYER, TYRIE W.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DONNA L PORTER

Jacksonville, FL 32210

Defendant

RICHARD E WALKER

Jacksonville, FL 32210

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Kowalski, James Anthony Jr

126 W Adams St

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3849

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFFS AND REQUEST FOR ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF'S TO REMOVE LOCKS PLACED ON SUBJECT PROPERTY

5/7/2020- D25- NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFFS AND REQUEST FOR ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF'S TO REMOVE LOCKS PLACED ON SUBJECT PROPERTY

MOTION FOR SANCTIIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFFS AND REQEST FOR ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO REMOVE LOCKS PLACED ON SUBJECT PROPERTY (DEFENDANT'S EMERGENCY)

4/27/2020- D24- MOTION FOR SANCTIIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFFS AND REQEST FOR ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO REMOVE LOCKS PLACED ON SUBJECT PROPERTY (DEFENDANT'S EMERGENCY)

CASE TRANSFERRED FROM COUNTY COURT

1/29/2020- D22- CASE TRANSFERRED FROM COUNTY COURT

CASE FEES PAID: $300.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3630996

3/5/2020- D23- CASE FEES PAID: $300.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3630996

CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3558026

1/29/2020- D20- CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3558026

ORDER GRANTING MOTION (DEFTS.) FOR LACK OF JURIDICTION AND RELATED ORDER TRANSFERRING MATTER

12/26/2019- D17- ORDER GRANTING MOTION (DEFTS.) FOR LACK OF JURIDICTION AND RELATED ORDER TRANSFERRING MATTER

NOTICE (CROSS) OF HEARING - 12/11/19 @3:30 PM - HR 723

12/9/2019- D15- NOTICE (CROSS) OF HEARING - 12/11/19 @3:30 PM - HR 723

MOTION TO PERMIT DISCOVERY - FILED BY DEF

12/9/2019- D14- MOTION TO PERMIT DISCOVERY - FILED BY DEF

ORDER SETTING HEARING 12-11-19 @ 03:30PM IN ROOM 723

12/6/2019- D12- ORDER SETTING HEARING 12-11-19 @ 03:30PM IN ROOM 723

UNABLE TO ISSUE DEFAULT DEFENDANT FILED A MOTION

11/27/2019- D11- UNABLE TO ISSUE DEFAULT DEFENDANT FILED A MOTION

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO RICHARD E. WALKER

11/27/2019- D10- MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO RICHARD E. WALKER

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT RICHARD E. WALKER

11/27/2019- D9- NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT RICHARD E. WALKER

MOTION FOR DEFAULT RICHARD E. WALKER

11/27/2019- D8- MOTION FOR DEFAULT RICHARD E. WALKER

MOTION TO DISMISS PLTFS. COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION, INCORPORATED REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING, AND GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY DEFT., RICHARD WALKER

11/26/2019- D7- MOTION TO DISMISS PLTFS. COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION, INCORPORATED REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING, AND GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY DEFT., RICHARD WALKER

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO RICHARD E WALKER ON 11/19/19 @9:10AM, POSTED

11/20/2019- D6- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO RICHARD E WALKER ON 11/19/19 @9:10AM, POSTED

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR RICHARD E. WALKER

11/13/2019- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED FOR RICHARD E. WALKER

COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

11/13/2019- D3- COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3558026

11/10/2019- D1- CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3558026

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/11/2020; NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFFS AND REQUEST FOR ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF'S TO REMOVE LOCKS PLACED ON SUBJECT PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/28/2020; MOTION FOR SANCTIIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFFS AND REQEST FOR ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO REMOVE LOCKS PLACED ON SUBJECT PROPERTY (DEFENDANT'S EMERGENCY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/OTHER REAL PROP 0-50K 3/6/2018; Assessed : $300.00; Paid : $300.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $300.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3630996

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2020; OTHER REAL PROPERTY ACTIONS $0 - $50,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2020; CASE TRANSFERRED FROM COUNTY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/29/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3558026

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/29/2020; RECEIPT NUMBER 3558026 HAD A REFUND OF $300.00 AMOUNT SENT TO RONNIE FUSSELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/29/2020; RECEIPT NUMBER 3558026 REVISED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/26/2019; ORDER GRANTING MOTION (DEFTS.) FOR LACK OF JURIDICTION AND RELATED ORDER TRANSFERRING MATTER

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/27/2019; MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO RICHARD E. WALKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/27/2019; NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT RICHARD E. WALKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/27/2019; MOTION FOR DEFAULT RICHARD E. WALKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/27/2019; MOTION TO DISMISS PLTFS. COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION, INCORPORATED REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING, AND GENERAL DENIAL FILED BY DEFT., RICHARD WALKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/21/2019; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO RICHARD E WALKER ON 11/19/19 @9:10AM, POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketEntered: 11/13/2019; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/13/2019; SUMMONS ISSUED FOR RICHARD E. WALKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/13/2019; COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketEntered: 11/13/2019; CIVIL COMPLAINT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/13/2019; CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3558026

    Read MoreRead Less