Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 01/28/2021 at 22:01:26 (UTC).

DISTINCTIVE PROPERTIES OF JACKSONVILLE INC. VS DAVID ERIC HARDENBROOK Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/05/2020 DISTINCTIVE PROPERTIES OF JACKSONVILLE INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DAVID ERIC HARDENBROOK. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DEES, ROBERT M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DEES, ROBERT M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISTINCTIVE PROPERTIES OF JACKSONVILLE INC.

1774 Leyburn Ct

Jacksonville, FL 32223

Defendants

DIANA HARDENBROOK SPEARS

Odum, GA 31555

DAVID ERIC HARDENBROOK

Cleveland, OH 44130

PAULA HARDENBROOK

Blackshear, GA 31516

THE UNKNOWN HEIRS AND DEVISEES OF ERIC S. HARDENBROOK, DECEASED

Jacksonville, FL 32254

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wood, Charles Roberts

12428 San Jose Blvd Ste 1

Jacksonville, FL 32223-8617

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT AGAINST THE UNKNOWN HEIRS AND DEVISEES OF ERIC S. HARDENBROOK, DECEASED

7/23/2020- D29- DEFAULT AGAINST THE UNKNOWN HEIRS AND DEVISEES OF ERIC S. HARDENBROOK, DECEASED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT ; THE UNKNOWN HEIRS AND DEVISEES OF ERIC S. HARDENBROOK, DECEASED MODIFICATION

7/22/2020- D27- MOTION FOR DEFAULT ; THE UNKNOWN HEIRS AND DEVISEES OF ERIC S. HARDENBROOK, DECEASED MODIFICATION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE OF ACTION

7/13/2020- D26- PROOF OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE OF ACTION

NOTICE OF ACTION - ISSUED FOR THE UNKNOWN HEIRS AND DEVISEES OF ERIC S. HARDENSBROOK, DECEASED

6/15/2020- D25- NOTICE OF ACTION - ISSUED FOR THE UNKNOWN HEIRS AND DEVISEES OF ERIC S. HARDENSBROOK, DECEASED

CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3675412

6/15/2020- D24- CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3675412

DEFAULT AGAINST PAULA HARDENBROOK A/K/A PAULA MUSICA, DAVID ERIC HARDENBROOK A/K/A DAVID E. HARDENBROOK AND DIANA HARDENBROOK SPEARS F/K/A DIANA MARIE HARDENBROOK F/K/A DIANA M. HARDENBROOK

6/10/2020- D21- DEFAULT AGAINST PAULA HARDENBROOK A/K/A PAULA MUSICA, DAVID ERIC HARDENBROOK A/K/A DAVID E. HARDENBROOK AND DIANA HARDENBROOK SPEARS F/K/A DIANA MARIE HARDENBROOK F/K/A DIANA M. HARDENBROOK

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY ; THE UNKNOWN HEIRS AND DEVISEES OF ERIC S. HARDENBROOK, DECEASED

6/8/2020- D20- AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY ; THE UNKNOWN HEIRS AND DEVISEES OF ERIC S. HARDENBROOK, DECEASED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT ; PAULA HARDENBROOK A/K/A PAULA MUSICA, DAVID ERIC HARDENBROOK A/K/A DAVID E. HARDENBROOK AND DIANA HARDENBROOK SPEARS F/K/A DIANA MARIE HARDENBROOK F/K/A DIANA M. HARDENBROOK

6/8/2020- D16- MOTION FOR DEFAULT ; PAULA HARDENBROOK A/K/A PAULA MUSICA, DAVID ERIC HARDENBROOK A/K/A DAVID E. HARDENBROOK AND DIANA HARDENBROOK SPEARS F/K/A DIANA MARIE HARDENBROOK F/K/A DIANA M. HARDENBROOK

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ; PAULA HARDENBROOK A/K/A PAULA MUSICA ON 3/20/2020 @ 3:00 PM

5/5/2020- D15- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ; PAULA HARDENBROOK A/K/A PAULA MUSICA ON 3/20/2020 @ 3:00 PM

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ; DAVID ERIC HARDENBROOK A/K/A DAVID E. HARDENBROOK ON 3/25/2020 @ 3:46 PM

4/7/2020- D14- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ; DAVID ERIC HARDENBROOK A/K/A DAVID E. HARDENBROOK ON 3/25/2020 @ 3:46 PM

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ; DIANA HARDENBROOK SPEARS F/K/A DIANA MARIE HARDENBROOK F/K/A DIANA M. HARDENBROOK ON 3/17/2020 @ 11:20

4/7/2020- D13- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ; DIANA HARDENBROOK SPEARS F/K/A DIANA MARIE HARDENBROOK F/K/A DIANA M. HARDENBROOK ON 3/17/2020 @ 11:20

CASE FEES PAID: $441.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3631171

3/5/2020- D10- CASE FEES PAID: $441.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3631171

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

3/5/2020- D5- VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

3/5/2020- D3- NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

3/5/2020- D2- COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 8/6/2020; FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE BOOK 19316 PAGE 2461-2464

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/23/2020; MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO QUIET TITLE (PLAINTIFF'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/23/2020; DEFAULT AGAINST THE UNKNOWN HEIRS AND DEVISEES OF ERIC S. HARDENBROOK, DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/23/2020; NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ; THE UNKNOWN HEIRS AND DEVISEES OF ERIC S. HARDENBROOK, DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/23/2020; MOTION FOR DEFAULT ; THE UNKNOWN HEIRS AND DEVISEES OF ERIC S. HARDENBROOK, DECEASED MODIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/13/2020; PROOF OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE OF ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : NOTICE OF ACTION ($10/ea); Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/15/2020; NOTICE OF ACTION - ISSUED FOR THE UNKNOWN HEIRS AND DEVISEES OF ERIC S. HARDENSBROOK, DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/15/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3675412

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/15/2020; AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR CONSTRUCTIVE SERVCICE BY PUBLICAITON; THE UNKNOWN HEIRS AND DEVISEES OF ERIC S. HARDENSBROOK, DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $441.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3631171

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2020; OTHER REAL PROPERTY ACTIONS $0 - $50,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO: DIANA HARDENBROOK SPEARS F/K/A DIANA MARIE HARDENBROOK F/K/A DIANA M. HARDENBROOK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO: DAVID ERIC HARDENBROOK A/K/A DAVID E. HARDENBROOK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO: PAULA HARDENBROOK A/K/A PAULA MUSICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2020; VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO: THE UNKNOWN HEIRS AND DEVISEES OF ERIC S. HARDENBROOK, DECEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2020; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2020; COMPLAINT TO QUIET TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less