This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 08/13/2020 at 00:05:41 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS AMANDA N GERTH

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 DISCOVER BANK filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against AMANDA N GERTH. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORAN, JOHN A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORAN, JOHN A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

10550 Deerwood Park Blvd, Building 300

Jacksonville, FL 32256

Defendant

AMANDA N GERTH

Jacksonville, FL 32244

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Murally, Thishan

10751 Deerwood Park Blvd Ste 100

Jacksonville, FL 32256-4835

 

Court Documents

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

4/27/2020- D17- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

3/18/2020- D16- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM FROM PLAINTIFF

3/4/2020- D12- FINAL DISPOSITION FORM FROM PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FROM PLAINTIFF

3/4/2020- D11- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FROM PLAINTIFF

RETURN OF NON-SERVICE 02/22/2020 @ 1:23PM AMANDA N GERTH

3/2/2020- D10- RETURN OF NON-SERVICE 02/22/2020 @ 1:23PM AMANDA N GERTH

SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY ISSUED FOR: AMANDA GERTH BK# 3:20-BK-00593

2/21/2020- D8- SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY ISSUED FOR: AMANDA GERTH BK# 3:20-BK-00593

CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3607830

2/4/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3607830

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR AMANDA N GERTH :PLAINTIFF

2/3/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR AMANDA N GERTH :PLAINTIFF

STATEMENT OF CLAIM :PLAINTIFF

2/3/2020- D2- STATEMENT OF CLAIM :PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET :PLAINTIFF

2/3/2020- D1- COVER SHEET :PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 06/12/2020 9:00 AM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; > CANCEL REASON - RESCHEDULING DUE TO COVID-19 OR BK19179 PG1359

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 4/28/2020 1:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 04/28/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; > CANCEL REASON - RESCHEDULING FOR PUBLICS SAFETY DUE TO COVID-19 VIRUS - OR BK19140 PG2359

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY ISSUED FOR: AMANDA GERTH BK# 3:20-BK-00593

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS>$500/=; Assessed : $175.00; Paid : $175.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED AMANDA N GERTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 03/19/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3607830

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $501 - $2,500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR AMANDA N GERTH :PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; STATEMENT OF CLAIM :PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; COVER SHEET :PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less