Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 01/29/2021 at 05:21:01 (UTC).

DAVID SLIWINSKI VS WANDA SLIWINSKI

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 DAVID SLIWINSKI filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WANDA SLIWINSKI. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BASS, SUZANNE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BASS, SUZANNE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DAVID SLIWINSKI

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Respondent

WANDA SLIWINSKI

Atlantic Beach, FL 32233

Not Classified By Court

Mediator

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Sussman, Stephanie Ann

501 Riverside Ave Ste 903

Jacksonville, FL 32202-4940

Respondent Attorney

Reiter, Dee D

233 E Bay St Ste 725

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3448

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Price, Ned Irwin

1616 Jork Rd Ste 201

Jacksonville, FL 32207-2493

 

Court Documents

CHECKLIST FOR UNCONTESTED DIVORCES (4TH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT)

10/19/2020- D32- CHECKLIST FOR UNCONTESTED DIVORCES (4TH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT)

PROOF OF RESIDENCY -DAVID

10/19/2020- D31- PROOF OF RESIDENCY -DAVID

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY / NONAVAILABILITY 11/13/2020- 11/17/2020, 11/25/2020- 11/30/2020 AND 12/18/2020- 01/04/2021

9/22/2020- D25- NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY / NONAVAILABILITY 11/13/2020- 11/17/2020, 11/25/2020- 11/30/2020 AND 12/18/2020- 01/04/2021

NOTICE OF HEARING (FINAL) 10/15/2020 9:30 AM EX PARTE VIA ZOOM

8/31/2020- D24- NOTICE OF HEARING (FINAL) 10/15/2020 9:30 AM EX PARTE VIA ZOOM

FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (AMENDED) WANDA SLIWINSKI

8/10/2020- D22- FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (AMENDED) WANDA SLIWINSKI

COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF/ DAVID SLIWINSKI/ATTY

3/18/2020- D2- COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF/ DAVID SLIWINSKI/ATTY

FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT /WANDA SLIWINSKI

4/24/2020- D20- FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT /WANDA SLIWINSKI

CASE FEES PAID: $295.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3647395

4/1/2020- D12- CASE FEES PAID: $295.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3647395

CASE FEES PAID: $409.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3640075

3/18/2020- D7- CASE FEES PAID: $409.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3640075

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL STEPHANIE SUSSMAN FOR DAVID SLIWINSKI

3/18/2020- D3- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL STEPHANIE SUSSMAN FOR DAVID SLIWINSKI

STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

3/18/2020- D5- STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketEntered: 1/6/2021; NOTICE OF FILING DOMESTIC RETURN RECEIPT/DAVID SLIWINSKI/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/20/2020; CHECKLIST FOR UNCONTESTED DIVORCES (4TH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/20/2020; PROOF OF RESIDENCY -DAVID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/15/2020; ORDER (QUALIFIED MILITARY RETIRED PAY DIVISION) BOOK 19414 PAGE 891-898

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/15/2020; CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE BOOK 19414 PAGE 844-860

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/22/2020; NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY / NONAVAILABILITY 11/13/2020- 11/17/2020, 11/25/2020- 11/30/2020 AND 12/18/2020- 01/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/31/2020; NOTICE OF HEARING (FINAL) 10/15/2020 9:30 AM EX PARTE VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketEntered: 8/14/2020; DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/11/2020; FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (AMENDED) WANDA SLIWINSKI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketEntered: 8/7/2020; NOTICE (HUSAND'S FIRST) OF PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/24/2020; ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS OF PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF, COVER SHEET, ETC. 03/23/2020/WANDA SLIWINSKI/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/24/2020; CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE /DAVID SLIWINSKI/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/DISSOLUTION MARRIAGE 7/1/2019; Assessed : $409.00; Paid : $409.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/19/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $409.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3640075

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/19/2020; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL STEPHANIE SUSSMAN FOR DAVID SLIWINSKI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/19/2020; NOTICE OF RELATED CASES -NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/19/2020; STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/19/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/19/2020; COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF/ DAVID SLIWINSKI/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/19/2020; DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mediator is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Price, Ned Irwin