This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 09/11/2020 at 00:34:27 (UTC).

DANIEL ANDERSON VS DEBORAH BLACKWOOD

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 DANIEL ANDERSON filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against DEBORAH BLACKWOOD. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ARIAS, ROBERTO A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ARIAS, ROBERTO A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DANIEL ANDERSON

Jacksonville, FL 32209

Defendant

DEBORAH BLACKWOOD

Jacksonville, FL 32208

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED 03/04/2020 10:30AM EXECUTED, DEBORAH L BLACKWOOD

3/5/2020- D16- WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED 03/04/2020 10:30AM EXECUTED, DEBORAH L BLACKWOOD

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

3/2/2020- D14- WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3626895

2/28/2020- D15- CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3626895

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST DEBORAH BLACKWOOD

2/25/2020- D12- MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST DEBORAH BLACKWOOD

DEFAULT AS TO DEBORAH BLACKWOOD

2/25/2020- D11- DEFAULT AS TO DEBORAH BLACKWOOD

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DEBORAH BLACKWOOD

2/25/2020- D10- MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DEBORAH BLACKWOOD

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT - DEBORAH BLACKWOOD

2/25/2020- D9- NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT - DEBORAH BLACKWOOD

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE DEBRA L. BLACKWOOD ON FEB. 12, 2020 AT 3:30 PM SERVED.

2/14/2020- D8- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE DEBRA L. BLACKWOOD ON FEB. 12, 2020 AT 3:30 PM SERVED.

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DEBORAH BLACK WOOD

2/12/2020- D6- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DEBORAH BLACK WOOD

COVER SHEET

2/12/2020- D5- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

2/12/2020- D4- COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

CASE FEES PAID: $195.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3613511

2/12/2020- D3- CASE FEES PAID: $195.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3613511

SUMMONS ISSUED DEBORAH BLACKWOOD

2/12/2020- D2- SUMMONS ISSUED DEBORAH BLACKWOOD

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2020; WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED 03/04/2020 10:30AM EXECUTED, DEBORAH L BLACKWOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : WRIT OF POSSESSION; Assessed : $7.00; Paid : $7.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2020; WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3626895

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/28/2020; FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION BOOK 19124 PAGE 741-741

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST DEBORAH BLACKWOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; DEFAULT AS TO DEBORAH BLACKWOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST DEBORAH BLACKWOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT - DEBORAH BLACKWOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/18/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE DEBRA L. BLACKWOOD ON FEB. 12, 2020 AT 3:30 PM SERVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/12/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS DEBORAH BLACK WOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/12/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/12/2020; COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/12/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $195.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3613511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/12/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED DEBORAH BLACKWOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/12/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less