This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 06/09/2020 at 16:28:42 (UTC).

CYPRESS LANDING APTS LP, A PENNSYLVANIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS TYRONE MONTGOMERY

Case Summary

On 01/27/2020 CYPRESS LANDING APTS LP, A PENNSYLVANIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against TYRONE MONTGOMERY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DRAKE, PAULINE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DRAKE, PAULINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CYPRESS LANDING APTS LP, A PENNSYLVANIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

17 Mlk St. S. Suite 200

St. Petersburg, FL 33705

Defendant

TYRONE MONTGOMERY

Jacksonville, FL 32209

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eason, Bruce Kirkpatrick

17 Dr Martin Luther King Jr St S Ste 200

St Petersburg, FL 33705-1616

 

Court Documents

ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING EVICTIONS FOR NON-PAYMENT AND REQUIRING FURTHER PLEADING FROM PLAINTIFF

6/5/2020- D13- ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING EVICTIONS FOR NON-PAYMENT AND REQUIRING FURTHER PLEADING FROM PLAINTIFF

DEFAULT AS TO TYRONE MONTGOMERY

2/10/2020- D12- DEFAULT AS TO TYRONE MONTGOMERY

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION AGAINST TYRONE MONTGOMERY

2/7/2020- D11- MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION AGAINST TYRONE MONTGOMERY

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) AGAINST TYRONE MONTGOMERY

2/7/2020- D10- MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) AGAINST TYRONE MONTGOMERY

VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE - TYRONE MONTGOMERY

2/7/2020- D9- VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE - TYRONE MONTGOMERY

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TYRONE MONTGOMERY ON JAN. 30, 2020 AT 4:30 PM SUBSTITUTED.

2/3/2020- D8- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TYRONE MONTGOMERY ON JAN. 30, 2020 AT 4:30 PM SUBSTITUTED.

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS TYRONE MONTGOMERY

1/29/2020- D7- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS TYRONE MONTGOMERY

COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

1/27/2020- D4- COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

SUMMONS ISSUED TYRONE MONTGOMERY

1/27/2020- D3- SUMMONS ISSUED TYRONE MONTGOMERY

COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S(CIVIL)

1/27/2020- D1- COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S(CIVIL)

CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3603803

1/29/2020- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3603803

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TYRONE MONTGOMERY

1/27/2020- D2- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TYRONE MONTGOMERY

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/8/2020; ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING EVICTIONS FOR NON-PAYMENT AND REQUIRING FURTHER PLEADING FROM PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/10/2020; DEFAULT AS TO TYRONE MONTGOMERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/10/2020; MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION AGAINST TYRONE MONTGOMERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/10/2020; MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) AGAINST TYRONE MONTGOMERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/10/2020; VERIFICATION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE - TYRONE MONTGOMERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/4/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TYRONE MONTGOMERY ON JAN. 30, 2020 AT 4:30 PM SUBSTITUTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed : $3.50; Paid : $3.50; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/29/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS TYRONE MONTGOMERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/29/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3603803

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/29/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/29/2020; COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/29/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TYRONE MONTGOMERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/29/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING TYRONE MONTGOMERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/29/2020; COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S(CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less