This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 06/14/2020 at 00:23:24 (UTC).

CVI SGP-CO ACQUISITION TRUST VS CHRISTOPHE M BAGGETT

Case Summary

On 02/05/2020 CVI SGP-CO ACQUISITION TRUST filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHRISTOPHE M BAGGETT. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FLOWER, GARY P.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FLOWER, GARY P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CVI SGP-CO ACQUISITION TRUST

801 International Parkway Suite 500

Lake Mary, FL 32746

Defendant

CHRISTOPHE M BAGGETT

Jacksonville, FL 32211-4941

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hines, Michelle Kim

Po Box 952289

Lake Mary, FL 32795-2289

 

Court Documents

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

4/27/2020- D13- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

3/18/2020- D12- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO CHRISTOPHE M BAGGETT ON 03/02/20 @3:35PM

3/9/2020- D8- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO CHRISTOPHE M BAGGETT ON 03/02/20 @3:35PM

SUMMONS ISSUED CHRISTOPHER M. BAGGETT

2/7/2020- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED CHRISTOPHER M. BAGGETT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR CHRISTOPHER M. BAGGETT - PLAINTIFF

2/5/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR CHRISTOPHER M. BAGGETT - PLAINTIFF

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - PLAINTIFF

2/5/2020- D2- STATEMENT OF CLAIM - PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

2/5/2020- D1- COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3610371

2/7/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3610371

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 06/12/2020 9:00 AM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; > CANCEL REASON - RESCHEDULING DUE TO COVID-19 OR BK19179 PG1359

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 4/28/2020 1:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 04/28/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; > CANCEL REASON - RESCHEDULING FOR PUBLICS SAFETY DUE TO COVID-19 VIRUS - OR BK19140 PG2359

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/10/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO CHRISTOPHE M BAGGETT ON 03/02/20 @3:35PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS >$2500 <=$15,000 1/1/2020; Assessed : $300.00; Paid : $300.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/7/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED CHRISTOPHER M. BAGGETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/7/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 03/19/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/7/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3610371

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/7/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $2,501 - $5,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/7/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR CHRISTOPHER M. BAGGETT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/7/2020; STATEMENT OF CLAIM - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/7/2020; COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less