This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 02/03/2021 at 17:16:09 (UTC).

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC ASSIGNEE OF COMENITY BANK (EXPRESS) VS LISA CATON

Case Summary

On 10/26/2020 CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC ASSIGNEE OF COMENITY BANK EXPRESS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LISA CATON. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MITCHELL, SCOTT F.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MITCHELL, SCOTT F.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC ASSIGNEE OF COMENITY BANK (EXPRESS)

100 Second Ave South Suite 306S

Saint Petersburg, FL 33701

Defendant

LISA CATON

Jacksonville, FL 32217

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fornaro, Matthew

11555 Heron Bay Blvd Ste 200

Coral Springs, FL 33076-3362

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

11/20/2020- D9- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

RETURN OF NON-SERVICE 11/10/2020 11:57AM UNKNOWN, LISA CATON

11/17/2020- D8- RETURN OF NON-SERVICE 11/10/2020 11:57AM UNKNOWN, LISA CATON

SUMMONS ISSUED LISA CATON

10/27/2020- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED LISA CATON

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING - PLAINTIFF

10/26/2020- D4- NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING - PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR LISA CATON - PLAINTIFF

10/26/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR LISA CATON - PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

10/26/2020- D2- COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

10/26/2020- D1- COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3743258

10/27/2020- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3743258

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2020; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/17/2020; RETURN OF NON-SERVICE 11/10/2020 11:57AM UNKNOWN, LISA CATON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS>$500/=; Assessed : $175.00; Paid : $175.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED LISA CATON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3743258

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $501 - $2,500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR LISA CATON - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2020; COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crown Asset Management LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FORNARO, MATTHEW