This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 09/11/2020 at 15:40:23 (UTC).

CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC. VS SANDR WILSON

Case Summary

On 02/06/2020 CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against SANDR WILSON. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HIGBEE, RONALD P.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HIGBEE, RONALD P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC.

5104 S Westshore Blvd

Tampa, FL 33611

Defendant

SANDR WILSON

Jacksonville, FL 32211

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hempfling, Jonathan Philip

5104 S West Shore Blvd

Tampa, FL 33611-5650

 

Court Documents

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

4/27/2020- D14- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS 3/10/20 (PERSONALLY) ON SANDRA WILSON

3/19/2020- D13- RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS 3/10/20 (PERSONALLY) ON SANDRA WILSON

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

3/18/2020- D12- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

SUMMONS ISSUED SANDR WILSON

2/10/2020- D8- SUMMONS ISSUED SANDR WILSON

CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3611919

2/10/2020- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3611919

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR SANDR WILSON - PLAINTFF

2/6/2020- D4- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR SANDR WILSON - PLAINTFF

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING - PLAINTIFF

2/6/2020- D3- NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING - PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

2/6/2020- D2- COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

2/6/2020- D1- COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/19/2020; RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS 3/10/20 (PERSONALLY) ON SANDRA WILSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 05/05/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; > CANCEL REASON - RESCHEDULING FOR PUBLICS SAFETY DUE TO COVID-19 VIRUS - OR BK19140 PG2388

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 3/26/2020 1:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS>$500/=; Assessed : $175.00; Paid : $175.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/10/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED SANDR WILSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/10/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 03/26/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/10/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3611919

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/10/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $501 - $2,500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/10/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR SANDR WILSON - PLAINTFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/10/2020; NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/10/2020; COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/10/2020; COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less