This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/28/2021 at 17:37:47 (UTC).

CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS, INC. VS MONIQUE PATRICK

Case Summary

On 01/28/2020 CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MONIQUE PATRICK. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FERGUSON, III, EMMET F.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FERGUSON, III, EMMET F.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS, INC.

806 Douglas Road, South Tower, Suite 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant

MONIQUE PATRICK

Jacksonville, FL 32218

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steele, Anthony John

1980 Michigan Ave

Cocoa, FL 32922-5729

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON SUMMONS 06/29/2020 @ 5:30PM MONIQUE PATRICK - NOT KNOWN AT ADDRESS GIVEN

8/8/2020- D15- SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON SUMMONS 06/29/2020 @ 5:30PM MONIQUE PATRICK - NOT KNOWN AT ADDRESS GIVEN

SUMMONS ISSUED MONIQUE PATRICK

6/15/2020- D14- SUMMONS ISSUED MONIQUE PATRICK

CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3662082

5/8/2020- D12- CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3662082

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (MONIQUE PATRICK) ALIAS - PLAINTIFF

5/7/2020- D11- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (MONIQUE PATRICK) ALIAS - PLAINTIFF

RETURN OF NON-SERVICE ON SUMMONS TO MONIQUE PATRICK FOR 03/12/20 @1:30PM COURT HEARING

3/6/2020- D10- RETURN OF NON-SERVICE ON SUMMONS TO MONIQUE PATRICK FOR 03/12/20 @1:30PM COURT HEARING

SUMMONS ISSUED MONIQUE PATRICK

1/28/2020- D9- SUMMONS ISSUED MONIQUE PATRICK

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - PLAINTIFF

1/28/2020- D5- STATEMENT OF CLAIM - PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (MONIQUE PATRICK) - PLAINTIFF

1/28/2020- D4- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (MONIQUE PATRICK) - PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING - PLAINTIFF

1/28/2020- D3- NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING - PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS - PLAINTIFF

1/28/2020- D2- NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS - PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET - PLAINTIFF

1/28/2020- D1- COVER SHEET - PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3603364

1/28/2020- D7- CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3603364

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/10/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON SUMMONS 06/29/2020 @ 5:30PM MONIQUE PATRICK - NOT KNOWN AT ADDRESS GIVEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/15/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED MONIQUE PATRICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketEntered: 5/8/2020; UNABLE TO ISSUE - SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED AT A LATER DATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/8/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3662082

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/8/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (MONIQUE PATRICK) ALIAS - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/6/2020; RETURN OF NON-SERVICE ON SUMMONS TO MONIQUE PATRICK FOR 03/12/20 @1:30PM COURT HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS>$500/=; Assessed : $175.00; Paid : $175.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED MONIQUE PATRICK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 03/12/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3603364

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $501 - $2,500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; STATEMENT OF CLAIM - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (MONIQUE PATRICK) - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; COVER SHEET - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC. ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEELE, ANTHONY JOHN