Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/28/2021 at 23:34:07 (UTC).

CHARLES SHEETS VS Brittany Mercer Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 CHARLES SHEETS filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against Brittany Mercer. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FLOWER, GARY P.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FLOWER, GARY P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHARLES SHEETS

Jacksonville, FL 32244

Defendants

CHRIS BORGER

Jacksonville, FL 32244

Brittany Mercer

 

Court Documents

ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING EVICTIONS FOR NON PAYMENT AND REQUIRING FURTHER PLEADING FROM PLAINTIFF

5/6/2020- D12- ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING EVICTIONS FOR NON PAYMENT AND REQUIRING FURTHER PLEADING FROM PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 02/14/2020 01:38PM POSTED, CHRIS BORGER

2/18/2020- D11- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 02/14/2020 01:38PM POSTED, CHRIS BORGER

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 02/14/2020 01:38PM POSTED, BRITTANY MERCER

2/18/2020- D10- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 02/14/2020 01:38PM POSTED, BRITTANY MERCER

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFT CHRIS BORGER & BRITTANY MERCER

2/12/2020- D8- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFT CHRIS BORGER & BRITTANY MERCER

SUMMONS ISSUED BRITTANY MERCER (COUNT II)

2/12/2020- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED BRITTANY MERCER (COUNT II)

SUMMONS ISSUED CHRIS BORGER (COUNT II)

2/12/2020- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED CHRIS BORGER (COUNT II)

SUMMONS ISSUED BRITTANY MERCER (COUNT I)

2/12/2020- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED BRITTANY MERCER (COUNT I)

SUMMONS ISSUED CHRIS BORGER (COUNT I)

2/12/2020- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED CHRIS BORGER (COUNT I)

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES

2/12/2020- D3- COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES

COVER SHEET

2/12/2020- D2- COVER SHEET

CASE FEES PAID: $225.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3613749

2/12/2020- D9- CASE FEES PAID: $225.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3613749

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/8/2020; ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING EVICTIONS FOR NON PAYMENT AND REQUIRING FURTHER PLEADING FROM PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 02/14/2020 01:38PM POSTED, CHRIS BORGER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 02/14/2020 01:38PM POSTED, BRITTANY MERCER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/12/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $225.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3613749

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/12/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFT CHRIS BORGER & BRITTANY MERCER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/12/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED BRITTANY MERCER (COUNT II)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/12/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED CHRIS BORGER (COUNT II)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/12/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED BRITTANY MERCER (COUNT I)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/12/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED CHRIS BORGER (COUNT I)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/12/2020; COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/12/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/12/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less