This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 10/09/2020 at 15:38:20 (UTC).

CARROLL MANAGEMENT , AS MANAGER FOR ARIUM DEERWOOD VS NATHANIEL COBY

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 CARROLL MANAGEMENT , AS MANAGER FOR ARIUM DEERWOOD filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against NATHANIEL COBY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANIGAN, ROBIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANIGAN, ROBIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARROLL MANAGEMENT , AS MANAGER FOR ARIUM DEERWOOD

C/O Dale G. Westling, Sr., Esquire 331 E Union St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendant

NATHANIEL COBY

Jacksonville, FL 32256

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Westling, Dale Gregory

331 Union St E Ste 2A

Jacksonville, FL 32202-2795

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS FOR NATHANIEL COBY

9/28/2020- D8- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS FOR NATHANIEL COBY

UNABLE TO ISSUE CERT. OF MAILING TO BE ISSUED AT A JATER DATE FOR NATHANIEL COBY

9/25/2020- D7- UNABLE TO ISSUE CERT. OF MAILING TO BE ISSUED AT A JATER DATE FOR NATHANIEL COBY

COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

9/25/2020- D4- COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR NATHANIEL COBY

9/25/2020- D3- SUMMONS ISSUED FOR NATHANIEL COBY

COVER SHEET (CIVIL)

9/25/2020- D1- COVER SHEET (CIVIL)

CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723154

9/25/2020- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723154

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR NATHANIEL COSBY

9/25/2020- D2- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR NATHANIEL COSBY

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/30/2020; AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH FEDERAL LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS FOR NATHANIEL COBY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed : $3.50; Paid : $3.50; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; UNABLE TO ISSUE CERT. OF MAILING TO BE ISSUED AT A JATER DATE FOR NATHANIEL COBY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723154

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED FOR NATHANIEL COBY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR NATHANIEL COSBY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COVER SHEET (CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less