This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 09/28/2020 at 00:02:42 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS TAJA L GREEN

Case Summary

On 02/05/2020 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against TAJA L GREEN. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUTH, JAMES A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUTH, JAMES A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

806 Douglas Road, South Tower, Suite 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant

TAJA L GREEN

Jacksonville, FL 32220-5030

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Spinozza, Kevin John

806 S Douglas Rd Ste 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134-2082

 

Court Documents

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

4/27/2020- D17- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL

4/6/2020- D16- STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

3/18/2020- D15- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

RETURN OF NON-SERVICE 02/21/2020 @ 1:05PM TO TAJA L GREEN

2/28/2020- D11- RETURN OF NON-SERVICE 02/21/2020 @ 1:05PM TO TAJA L GREEN

SUMMONS ISSUED TAJA L. GREEN

2/7/2020- D10- SUMMONS ISSUED TAJA L. GREEN

STATEMENT OF CLAIM -PLAINTIFF

2/5/2020- D6- STATEMENT OF CLAIM -PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR TAJA L. GREEN - PLAINTIFF

2/5/2020- D5- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR TAJA L. GREEN - PLAINTIFF

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT - PLAINTIFF

2/5/2020- D4- NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT - PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING - PLAINTIFF

2/5/2020- D3- NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING - PLAINTIFF

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS - PLAINTIFF

2/5/2020- D2- DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS - PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

2/5/2020- D1- COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3610279

2/7/2020- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3610279

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 06/12/2020 9:00 AM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; > CANCEL REASON - RESCHEDULING DUE TO COVID-19 OR BK19179 PG1359

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 4/28/2020 1:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/8/2020; STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 04/28/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/7/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TAJA L. GREEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/7/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 03/19/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/7/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3610279

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/7/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $501 - $2,500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/7/2020; STATEMENT OF CLAIM -PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/7/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR TAJA L. GREEN - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/7/2020; NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/7/2020; NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/7/2020; DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/7/2020; COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less