This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/29/2021 at 01:41:07 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. VS MARGRETTE Q BOYER

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA , N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARGRETTE Q BOYER. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FLOWER, GARY P.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FLOWER, GARY P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.

806 Douglas Road, South Tower, Suite 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant

MARGRETTE Q BOYER

Jacksonville, FL 32211

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Spinozza, Kevin John

806 S Douglas Rd Ste 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134-2082

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISMISSAL

8/5/2020- D19- ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISMISSAL

STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT AND PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL- PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT

7/22/2020- D18- STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT AND PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL- PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE BY ZOOM VIDEO OR TELEPHONICALLY 7/22/20 @ 2:00 P.M.

6/17/2020- D16- NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE BY ZOOM VIDEO OR TELEPHONICALLY 7/22/20 @ 2:00 P.M.

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

4/27/2020- D12- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 03/17/2020 @ 3:35PM INDIVIDUAL MARGRETTE Q BOYER

3/26/2020- D11- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 03/17/2020 @ 3:35PM INDIVIDUAL MARGRETTE Q BOYER

SUMMONS ISSUED - MARGRETTE Q BOYER

2/19/2020- D10- SUMMONS ISSUED - MARGRETTE Q BOYER

CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3617428

2/18/2020- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3617428

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - PLAINTIFF

2/18/2020- D6- STATEMENT OF CLAIM - PLAINTIFF

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR MARGRETTE Q BOYER- PLAINTIFF

2/18/2020- D5- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR MARGRETTE Q BOYER- PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING - PLAINTIFF

2/18/2020- D4- NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING - PLAINTIFF

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT - PLAINTIFF

2/18/2020- D3- NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT - PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS - PLAINTIFF

2/18/2020- D2- NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS - PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET - (CIVIL) - PLAINTIFF

2/18/2020- D1- COVER SHEET - (CIVIL) - PLAINTIFF

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/6/2020; ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/22/2020; STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT AND PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL- PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/22/2020; OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE - OTHER- SETTLED PER ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/18/2020; NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE BY ZOOM VIDEO OR TELEPHONICALLY 7/22/20 @ 2:00 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 06/26/2020 9:00 AM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; > CANCEL REASON - RESCHEDULING DUE TO COVID-19 OR BK19179 PG1359

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 4/2/2020 1:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED - MARGRETTE Q BOYER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 04/02/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $310.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3617428

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $2,501 - $5,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; STATEMENT OF CLAIM - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR MARGRETTE Q BOYER- PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; COVER SHEET - (CIVIL) - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spinozza, Kevin