This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 10/09/2020 at 15:43:06 (UTC).

CAM PROPERTIES VS PAMELA BISHOP

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 CAM PROPERTIES filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against PAMELA BISHOP. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ARIAS, ROBERTO A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ARIAS, ROBERTO A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAM PROPERTIES

P.O. Box 2932

Jacksonville, FL 32203

Defendant

PAMELA BISHOP

Jacksonville, FL 32206

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE POSTED 09-30-2020 AT 10:05 AM FOR PAMELA BISHOP

10/2/2020- D7- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE POSTED 09-30-2020 AT 10:05 AM FOR PAMELA BISHOP

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFENDANT PAMELA BISHOP

9/25/2020- D5- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFENDANT PAMELA BISHOP

SUMMONS ISSUED PAMELA BISHOP

9/25/2020- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED PAMELA BISHOP

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

9/25/2020- D3- COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

COVER SHEET

9/25/2020- D2- COVER SHEET

CASE FEES PAID: $195.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3722930

9/25/2020- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $195.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3722930

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/8/2020; REQUEST SUBIMITTED BY DEFENDANT PAMELA BISHOP ( REQUEST COURT DATE )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/2/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE POSTED 09-30-2020 AT 10:05 AM FOR PAMELA BISHOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $195.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3722930

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFENDANT PAMELA BISHOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED PAMELA BISHOP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less