This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 10/09/2020 at 15:31:47 (UTC).

BRANDON MCDUFFIE VS Desmond Leonard Calhaun Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 BRANDON MCDUFFIE filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against Desmond Leonard Calhaun. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUTH, JAMES A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUTH, JAMES A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRANDON MCDUFFIE

Middleburg, FL 32068

Defendants

JEREMY LEONARD CALHAUN

Jacksonville, FL 32210

Desmond Leonard Calhaun

Jacksonville, FL 32210

JEREMY LEONARD CALHOUN

Jacksonville, FL 32210

Desmond Leonard Calhoun

Jacksonville, FL 32210

 

Court Documents

UNABLE TO ISSUE DEFAULT AGAINST JEREMY AND DEMOND LEONARD-CALHOUN DEFENDANT'S FILED RESPONSES ON 10/6/2020

10/7/2020- D24- UNABLE TO ISSUE DEFAULT AGAINST JEREMY AND DEMOND LEONARD-CALHOUN DEFENDANT'S FILED RESPONSES ON 10/6/2020

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST JEREMY AND DESMOND LEONARD-CALHOUN

10/7/2020- D22- MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST JEREMY AND DESMOND LEONARD-CALHOUN

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AGAINST DESMOND LEONARD-CALHOUN

10/7/2020- D21- NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AGAINST DESMOND LEONARD-CALHOUN

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AGAINST JEREMY LEONARD-CALHOUN

10/7/2020- D20- NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AGAINST JEREMY LEONARD-CALHOUN

MEMORANDUM TO CASHIER RENT FOR ? REGISTRY $323.06 CLERK FEE $9.69

10/7/2020- D19- MEMORANDUM TO CASHIER RENT FOR ? REGISTRY $323.06 CLERK FEE $9.69

ANSWER -FILED BY DEFENDANT DESMOND LEONARD CALHOUN

10/7/2020- D25- ANSWER -FILED BY DEFENDANT DESMOND LEONARD CALHOUN

RESPONSE TO EVICTION COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFT., JEREMY LEONARD-CALHOUN

10/6/2020- D17- RESPONSE TO EVICTION COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFT., JEREMY LEONARD-CALHOUN

RESPONSE TO EVICTION COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFT., DESMOND LEONARD-CALHOUN

10/6/2020- D16- RESPONSE TO EVICTION COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFT., DESMOND LEONARD-CALHOUN

NOTICE OF DECLARATION UNDER PENALTY OF PERJURY FOR THE CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION'S TEMPORARY HALT IN EVICTION TO PREVENT FURTHER SPREAD OF COVID-19 FOR JEREMY LEONARD-CALHAUN

10/6/2020- D15- NOTICE OF DECLARATION UNDER PENALTY OF PERJURY FOR THE CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION'S TEMPORARY HALT IN EVICTION TO PREVENT FURTHER SPREAD OF COVID-19 FOR JEREMY LEONARD-CALHAUN

NOTICE OF DECLARATION UNDER PENALTY OF PERJURY FOR THE CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION'S TEMPORARY HALT IN EVICTION TO PREVENT FURTHER SPREAD OF COVID-19 FOR DESMOND LEONARD-CALHAUN

10/6/2020- D14- NOTICE OF DECLARATION UNDER PENALTY OF PERJURY FOR THE CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL AND PREVENTION'S TEMPORARY HALT IN EVICTION TO PREVENT FURTHER SPREAD OF COVID-19 FOR DESMOND LEONARD-CALHAUN

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE JEREMY CALHOUN 9/29/2020 @ 3:25PM (IND)

10/2/2020- D12- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE JEREMY CALHOUN 9/29/2020 @ 3:25PM (IND)

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE (CT II) DESMOND CALHOUN 9/29/2020 @ 3:25PM (IND)

10/2/2020- D11- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE (CT II) DESMOND CALHOUN 9/29/2020 @ 3:25PM (IND)

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS AGAINST DEFENDANT JEREMY LEONARD-CALHAUN AND DESMOND LEONARD-CALAUN

9/25/2020- D8- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS AGAINST DEFENDANT JEREMY LEONARD-CALHAUN AND DESMOND LEONARD-CALAUN

SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT DESMOND LEONARD-CALHAUN ( COUNT II )

9/25/2020- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT DESMOND LEONARD-CALHAUN ( COUNT II )

SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT JEREMY LEONARD-CALHAUN ( COUNT II )

9/25/2020- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT JEREMY LEONARD-CALHAUN ( COUNT II )

SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT DEMOND LEONARD-CALHAUN ( COUNT I )

9/25/2020- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT DEMOND LEONARD-CALHAUN ( COUNT I )

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES

9/25/2020- D3- COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES

COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF BRANDON MCDUFFIE = DEFENDANT JEREMY LEONARD CALHAUN AND DESMOND LEONARD CALHAUN

9/25/2020- D2- COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF BRANDON MCDUFFIE = DEFENDANT JEREMY LEONARD CALHAUN AND DESMOND LEONARD CALHAUN

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REGISTRY/GENCIV; Assessed : $332.75; Paid : $332.75; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/7/2020; UNABLE TO ISSUE DEFAULT AGAINST JEREMY AND DEMOND LEONARD-CALHOUN DEFENDANT'S FILED RESPONSES ON 10/6/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/7/2020; MOTION FOR DEFAULT AGAINST JEREMY AND DEMOND LEONARD-CALHOUN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/7/2020; MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST JEREMY AND DESMOND LEONARD-CALHOUN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/7/2020; NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AGAINST DESMOND LEONARD-CALHOUN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/7/2020; NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT AGAINST JEREMY LEONARD-CALHOUN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/7/2020; MEMORANDUM TO CASHIER RENT FOR ? REGISTRY $323.06 CLERK FEE $9.69

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/7/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $332.75 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3730568

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/7/2020; ANSWER -FILED BY DEFENDANT DESMOND LEONARD CALHOUN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/7/2020; RESPONSE TO EVICTION COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFT., JEREMY LEONARD-CALHOUN

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $225.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3722989

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS AGAINST DEFENDANT JEREMY LEONARD-CALHAUN AND DESMOND LEONARD-CALAUN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT DESMOND LEONARD-CALHAUN ( COUNT II )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT JEREMY LEONARD-CALHAUN ( COUNT II )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT DEMOND LEONARD-CALHAUN ( COUNT I )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO DEFENDANT JEREMY LEONARD-CALHAUN ( COUNT I )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF BRANDON MCDUFFIE = DEFENDANT JEREMY LEONARD CALHAUN AND DESMOND LEONARD CALHAUN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (UP TO $15000)

    Read MoreRead Less