Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 01/28/2021 at 22:04:38 (UTC).

BHAGAVATHI KAZA Et Al VS A&G CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/05/2020 BHAGAVATHI KAZA filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against A G CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Roberson, Eric. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Roberson, Eric

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BHAGAVATHI KAZA

Tampa, FL 33625

PRASANNA Mattegunta

Tampa, FL 33625

Defendants

COASTAL BUILDING SYSTEMS OF AMELIA INC

One Independent Drive Suite 1400

Jacksonville, FL 32202

CONSTRUCTION SOLUTIONS & SUPPLY LLC

4465 Baymeadows Road Suite 3

Jacksonville, FL 32217

ROYAL PAINTING OF JAX INC

3023 Whispering Willow Way

Orange Park, FL 32065

A&G CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC

5150 Belfort Road South Suite 500

Jacksonville, FL 32256

United Subcontractors Inc

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

STRANGE LATHING & PLASTERING INC

112 Eberhard Avenue

Palatka, FL 32177

RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF FLORIDA LP

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

Not Classified By Court

Mediator

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zudar, Joshua Michael

6507 Gunn Hwy

Tampa, FL 33625-4021

Other Attorneys

Ferguson, Elizabeth B

200 W Forsyth St Ste 1400

Jacksonville, FL 32202-4327

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ELIZABETH FERGUSON FOR CONSTRUCTION SOLUTIONS & SUPPLY LLC, ROYAL PAINTING OF JAX INC, STRANGE LATHING & PLASTERING INC, UNITED SUBCONTRACTORS INC, AND RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF FLORIDA LP

11/9/2020- D36- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ELIZABETH FERGUSON FOR CONSTRUCTION SOLUTIONS & SUPPLY LLC, ROYAL PAINTING OF JAX INC, STRANGE LATHING & PLASTERING INC, UNITED SUBCONTRACTORS INC, AND RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF FLORIDA LP

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO ROYAL PAINTING OF JAX INC ON 10/30/2020 @ 4:35PM

11/6/2020- D35- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO ROYAL PAINTING OF JAX INC ON 10/30/2020 @ 4:35PM

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ELIZABETH FERGUSON FOR CONSTRUCTION SOLUTIONS & SUPPLY LLC, STRANGE LATHING & PLASTERING INC, AND RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF FLORIDA LP

8/26/2020- D32- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ELIZABETH FERGUSON FOR CONSTRUCTION SOLUTIONS & SUPPLY LLC, STRANGE LATHING & PLASTERING INC, AND RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF FLORIDA LP

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS ON ROYAL PAINTING OF JAX INC., UNSERVED 08052020

8/20/2020- D29- RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS ON ROYAL PAINTING OF JAX INC., UNSERVED 08052020

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON A&G CONST GROUP INC 07/21/2020 @1140AM BY SUSAN SENTRY

7/30/2020- D27- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON A&G CONST GROUP INC 07/21/2020 @1140AM BY SUSAN SENTRY

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON UNITED SUBCONTRACTORS INC 07/20/2020 @110PM BY KARA STOVER

7/30/2020- D26- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON UNITED SUBCONTRACTORS INC 07/20/2020 @110PM BY KARA STOVER

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF FL LP 07/22/2020 @100PM BY DONNA MOCH

7/30/2020- D25- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF FL LP 07/22/2020 @100PM BY DONNA MOCH

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ELIZABETH FERGUSON FOR A&G CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC, UNITED SUBCONTRACTORS INC, AND RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF FLORIDA LP (RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF FLORIDA, LP'S UNITED SUBCONTRACTORS, INC. D/B/A FIRST CHOICE SUPPLY'S AND A&G CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.'S) AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

7/29/2020- D21- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ELIZABETH FERGUSON FOR A&G CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC, UNITED SUBCONTRACTORS INC, AND RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF FLORIDA LP (RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF FLORIDA, LP'S UNITED SUBCONTRACTORS, INC. D/B/A FIRST CHOICE SUPPLY'S AND A&G CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.'S) AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

CASE FEES PAID: $60.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3685162

7/9/2020- D20- CASE FEES PAID: $60.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3685162

CASE FEES PAID: $476.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3631048

3/5/2020- D11- CASE FEES PAID: $476.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3631048

COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

3/5/2020- D2- COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketEntered: 1/21/2021; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (DEFTS' CORRECTED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketEntered: 1/5/2021; NOTICE OF JOINDER TO RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF FLORIDA, LP'S, UNITED SUBCONTRACTOR, INC. D/B/A FIRST CHOICE SUPPLY'S AND A& G CONSTRUCTION GROUP,INC'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STAY OR ABATE PROCEEDINGS AND COMPEL ARBITRATION (STRANGE LATHING & PLASTERING, INC'S, CONSTRUCTION SOLUTIONS & SUPPLY, LLC'S AND ROYAL PAINTING OF JAX, INC'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketEntered: 1/5/2021; REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE PURSUANT TO 90.902(6) AND 90.903, FLA. STAT. (RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF FLORIDA, LP'S, STRANGE LATHING & PLASTERING,INC'S, ROYAL PAINTING OF JAX, INC'S, CONSTRUCTION SOLUTIONS & SUPPLY, LLC'S, UNITED SUBCONTRACTORS, INC D/B/A FIRST CHOICE SUPPLY'S AND A&G CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketEntered: 11/10/2020; NOTICE (ROYAL PAINTING OF JAX INCS) OF JOINDER TO RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF FLORIDA LP'S, UNITED SUBCONTRACTOR INC D/B/A FIRST CHOICE SUPPLYS AND A&G CONSTRUCTION GROUPS INCS MOTION TO STAY OR ABATE PROCEEDINGS AND COMPEL ARBITRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/10/2020; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ELIZABETH FERGUSON FOR CONSTRUCTION SOLUTIONS & SUPPLY LLC, ROYAL PAINTING OF JAX INC, STRANGE LATHING & PLASTERING INC, UNITED SUBCONTRACTORS INC, AND RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF FLORIDA LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/6/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO ROYAL PAINTING OF JAX INC ON 10/30/2020 @ 4:35PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/5/2020; NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 10/06/2020 @1000AM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketEntered: 8/27/2020; NOTICE OF MOTION TO STAY OR ABATE PRECEEDINGS AND COMPEL ARBITRATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/27/2020; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ELIZABETH FERGUSON FOR CONSTRUCTION SOLUTIONS & SUPPLY LLC, STRANGE LATHING & PLASTERING INC, AND RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF FLORIDA LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketEntered: 8/25/2020; SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED ON STRANGE LATHING & PLASTERING INC 08/04/2020 @825AM BY HARRIETT STRANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2020; OTHER NEGLIGENCE - CONSTRUCTION DEFECT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED - RICHMOND AMERICAN HOMES OF FLORIDA, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED - UNITED SUBCONTRACTORS, INC., D/B/A FIRST CHOICE SUPPLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED STRANGE LATHING & PLASTERING, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED - CONSTRUCTION SOLUTIONS & SUPPLY, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED - ROYAL PAINTING OF JAX, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED - COASTAL BUILDING SYSTEMS OF AMELIA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED - A & G CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2020; COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COASTAL BUILDING SYSTEMS OF AMELIA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where A&G CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ROYAL PAINTING OF JAX INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CONSTRUCTION SOLUTIONS & SUPPLY LLC is a litigant