Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 01/28/2021 at 22:00:42 (UTC).

BCEL 5B, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS BFF GROUP, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/05/2020 BCEL 5B, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BFF GROUP, LLC. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NORTON, VIRGINIA B.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NORTON, VIRGINIA B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BCEL 5B, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

7563 Philips Highway # 109

Jacksonville, FL 32256

Defendant

BFF GROUP, LLC

8625 Palisades Lake Drive

West Palm Beach, FL 33411

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bernard, Lawrence Jay

Attorney at Benard & Schemer, P.A.

480 Busch Dr

Jacksonville, FL 32218-5553

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT AGAINST BFF GROUP, LLC

5/27/2020- D19- DEFAULT AGAINST BFF GROUP, LLC

MOTION FOR DEFAULT ; BFF GROUP, LLC MODIFICATION

5/22/2020- D18- MOTION FOR DEFAULT ; BFF GROUP, LLC MODIFICATION

PROOF OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE OF ACTION

5/13/2020- D14- PROOF OF PUBLICATION - NOTICE OF ACTION

NOTICE OF ACTION - ISSUED FOR BFF GROUP, LLP, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

4/16/2020- D13- NOTICE OF ACTION - ISSUED FOR BFF GROUP, LLP, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION

4/10/2020- D9- AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION

CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3653004

4/8/2020- D11- CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3653004

COMPLAINT FOR QUIET TITLE

3/5/2020- D4- COMPLAINT FOR QUIET TITLE

CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3631412

3/5/2020- D7- CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3631412

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

3/5/2020- D3- NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

3/5/2020- D2- VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketEntered: 12/2/2020; RETURNED MAIL-UNDELIVERABLE (BFF GROUP, LLC) 2ND AMENDED SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/30/2020; FINAL JUDGMENT (SECOND AMENDED SUMMARY) QUIETING TITLE **DUPLICATE**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/18/2020; FINAL JUDGMENT (SECOND AMENDED SUMMARY) QUIETING TITLE BOOK 19376 PAGE 634-635

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/17/2020; RETURNED MAIL-UNDELIVERABLE (BFF GROUP LLC) ORDER SETTING HRG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/26/2020; FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/26/2020; AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE BOOK 19263 PAGE 1631-1632

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/23/2020; ORDER SETTING HEARING ; 6/26/2020 @ 10:45 AM TELEPHONICALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/27/2020; DEFAULT AGAINST BFF GROUP, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/27/2020; MOTION FOR DEFAULT ; BFF GROUP, LLC MODIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketEntered: 5/27/2020; AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT QUIETING TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/16/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3653004

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/OTHER REAL PROP 0-50K 3/6/2018; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/6/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3631412

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/6/2020; OTHER REAL PROPERTY ACTIONS $0 - $50,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/6/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO: BFF GROUP, LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/6/2020; COMPLAINT FOR QUIET TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/6/2020; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19133 PAGE 1699-1700

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/6/2020; VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/6/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BCEL 5B LLC, A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bernard, Lawrence Jay