Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/28/2021 at 23:41:55 (UTC).

BCEL 5A, LLC VS QUINTELLA BROWN Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 BCEL 5A, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against QUINTELLA BROWN. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BATEH, MICHAEL I. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BATEH, MICHAEL I

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BCEL 5A, LLC

6620 Southpoint Dr S Suite 200

Jacksonville, FL 32216

Defendants

QUINTELLA BROWN

Jacksonville, FL 32206

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1

Jacksonville, FL 32206

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edwards, Meghan Elizabeth

6620 Southpoint Dr S Ste 200

Jacksonville, FL 32216-0961

 

Court Documents

RETURNED MAIL-UNDELIVERABLE FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION

3/10/2020- D17- RETURNED MAIL-UNDELIVERABLE FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION

DEFAULT AGAINST QUINTELLA BROWN & UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1

2/27/2020- D15- DEFAULT AGAINST QUINTELLA BROWN & UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1

MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT/WRIT OF POSS/MIL AFF/PROOF OF CLAIM -FILED BY PLTF

2/26/2020- D14- MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT/WRIT OF POSS/MIL AFF/PROOF OF CLAIM -FILED BY PLTF

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) FOR QUINTELLA BROWN & UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1 -FILED BY PLTF

2/26/2020- D13- MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) FOR QUINTELLA BROWN & UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1 -FILED BY PLTF

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 02/15/20, @3:55PM, TO UNKNOWN TENANT 1, POSTED

2/26/2020- D12- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 02/15/20, @3:55PM, TO UNKNOWN TENANT 1, POSTED

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 02/15/20, @3:55PM, TO QUINTELLA BROWN, POSTED

2/26/2020- D11- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 02/15/20, @3:55PM, TO QUINTELLA BROWN, POSTED

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFT. QUINTELLA BROWN

2/14/2020- D9- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFT. QUINTELLA BROWN

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFT. UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1

2/14/2020- D10- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFT. UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1

COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

2/12/2020- D6- COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

SUMMONS ISSUED - UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1

2/12/2020- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED - UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1

SUMMONS ISSUED - QUINTELLA BROWN

2/12/2020- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED - QUINTELLA BROWN

COVER SHEET

2/12/2020- D1- COVER SHEET

CASE FEES PAID: $327.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3615262

2/13/2020- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $327.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3615262

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1

2/12/2020- D3- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - QUINTELLA BROWN

2/12/2020- D2- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - QUINTELLA BROWN

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/11/2020; RETURNED MAIL-UNDELIVERABLE FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/5/2020; FINAL JUDGMENT EVICTION BOOK 19130 PAGE 2307-2307

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/27/2020; DEFAULT AGAINST QUINTELLA BROWN & UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/27/2020; MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT/WRIT OF POSS/MIL AFF/PROOF OF CLAIM -FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/27/2020; MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) FOR QUINTELLA BROWN & UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1 -FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/27/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 02/15/20, @3:55PM, TO UNKNOWN TENANT 1, POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/27/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 02/15/20, @3:55PM, TO QUINTELLA BROWN, POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed : $3.50; Paid : $3.50; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS>$2500 3/1/2012; Assessed : $300.00; Paid : $300.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed : $3.50; Paid : $3.50; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFT. QUINTELLA BROWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFT. UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $327.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3615262

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; CIVIL COMPLAINT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED - UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED - QUINTELLA BROWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - QUINTELLA BROWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/14/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edwards, Meghan Elizabeth