This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/28/2021 at 17:38:28 (UTC).

BAYBRIDGE CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC, P.A. AS ASSIGNEE OF RALEIGH HOOKS VS ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/28/2020 BAYBRIDGE CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC, P A AS ASSIGNEE OF RALEIGH HOOKS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ARIAS, ROBERTO A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ARIAS, ROBERTO A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAYBRIDGE CHIROPRACTIC CLINIC, P.A. AS ASSIGNEE OF RALEIGH HOOKS

Jacksonville, FL 32256

Defendant

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E.Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Saben, Adam B

10245 Centurion Pkwy N Ste 109

Jacksonville, FL 32256-0569

Defendant Attorney

Parrino, Anthony Joseph

8950 Dr Martin Luther King Jr St N Ste 220

Saint Petersburg, FL 33702-3001

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY / NONAVAILABILITY -PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY, JULIA E. GAZECKA UNAVAILABILITY FOR THE FOLLOWING DATES: DECEMBER 23, 2020 THROUGH JANUARY 1, 2021

11/29/2020- D24- NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY / NONAVAILABILITY -PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY, JULIA E. GAZECKA UNAVAILABILITY FOR THE FOLLOWING DATES: DECEMBER 23, 2020 THROUGH JANUARY 1, 2021

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES /DEFENDANT'S (PLAINTIFF'S)

6/5/2020- D23- REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES /DEFENDANT'S (PLAINTIFF'S)

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT'S) PLAINTIFF'S

5/26/2020- D22- RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT'S) PLAINTIFF'S

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S)

5/26/2020- D21- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S)

ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL -DEFENDANT

5/18/2020- D20- ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL -DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

4/24/2020- D19- NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT

4/24/2020- D18- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT

4/24/2020- D17- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT

ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

3/19/2020- D16- ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

3/18/2020- D12- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

STIPULATION (JOINT) WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE - BOTH PARTIES

3/17/2020- D13- STIPULATION (JOINT) WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE - BOTH PARTIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ANTHONY PARRINO FOR ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

3/17/2020- D8- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ANTHONY PARRINO FOR ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

SUMMONS ISSUED ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

1/28/2020- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY :PLAINTIFF

1/28/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY :PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT :PLAINTIFF

1/28/2020- D2- COMPLAINT :PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET :PLAINTIFF

1/28/2020- D1- COVER SHEET :PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3603466

1/28/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3603466

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/30/2020; NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY / NONAVAILABILITY -PLAINTIFF ATTORNEY, JULIA E. GAZECKA UNAVAILABILITY FOR THE FOLLOWING DATES: DECEMBER 23, 2020 THROUGH JANUARY 1, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/8/2020; REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES /DEFENDANT'S (PLAINTIFF'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/27/2020; RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT'S) PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/27/2020; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/18/2020; ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL -DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/17/2020; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ANTHONY PARRINO FOR ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/6/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 03/19/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS; Assessed : $55.00; Paid : $55.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3603466

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $0 - $100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY :PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; COMPLAINT :PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; COVER SHEET :PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANTHONY J PARRINO