Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/28/2021 at 17:25:40 (UTC).

BARBARA LISA MOODISPAUGH AS PR ESTATE OF BARBARA E VS UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1 Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/27/2020 BARBARA LISA MOODISPAUGH AS PR ESTATE OF BARBARA E filed an Other lawsuit against UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORAN, JOHN A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORAN, JOHN A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARBARA LISA MOODISPAUGH AS PR ESTATE OF BARBARA E

6620 Southpoint Dr S Suite 200

Jacksonville, FL 32216

Defendants

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 2

Jacksonville, FL 32205

UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1

Jacksonville, FL 32205

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Edwards, Meghan Elizabeth

6620 Southpoint Dr S Ste 200

Jacksonville, FL 32216-0961

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED 3-12-20 @ 10:59AM

3/13/2020- D21- WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED 3-12-20 @ 10:59AM

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

3/6/2020- D19- WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT/WRIT OF POSS/MIL AFF/PROOF OF CLAIM , AND AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE AGAINST UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1 NKA JASON HICKOX, AND UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 2

2/24/2020- D17- MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT/WRIT OF POSS/MIL AFF/PROOF OF CLAIM , AND AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE AGAINST UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1 NKA JASON HICKOX, AND UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 2

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) (CT I) AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1 N/K/A JASON HICKOX & UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 2

2/21/2020- D15- MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) (CT I) AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1 N/K/A JASON HICKOX & UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 2

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS (CT I) ON UNKNOWN TENANT 2; SUBSTITUTE SERVED ON 2/6/20 @ 1:40PM

2/21/2020- D14- RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS (CT I) ON UNKNOWN TENANT 2; SUBSTITUTE SERVED ON 2/6/20 @ 1:40PM

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS (CT I) ON UNKNOWN TENANT 1 N/K/A JASON HICKOX; INDIVIDUALLY SERVED ON 2/6/20 @ 1:40PM

2/21/2020- D13- RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS (CT I) ON UNKNOWN TENANT 1 N/K/A JASON HICKOX; INDIVIDUALLY SERVED ON 2/6/20 @ 1:40PM

DEFAULT (CT I) AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1 N/K/A JASON HICKOX & UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 2

2/25/2020- D16- DEFAULT (CT I) AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1 N/K/A JASON HICKOX & UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 2

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS

1/28/2020- D12- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1

1/28/2020- D11- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 2 (CTII)

1/27/2020- D8- SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 2 (CTII)

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 2

1/27/2020- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 2

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1

1/27/2020- D6- SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1

SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1 (CTII)

1/27/2020- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1 (CTII)

CASE FEES PAID: $347.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3603123

1/28/2020- D10- CASE FEES PAID: $347.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3603123

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 2

1/27/2020- D4- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 2

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1

1/27/2020- D3- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1

COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

1/27/2020- D2- COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

COVER SHEET

1/27/2020- D1- COVER SHEET

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED 3-12-20 @ 10:59AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : WRIT OF POSSESSION; Assessed : $7.00; Paid : $7.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/9/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3632697

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/9/2020; WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/6/2020; FINAL JUDGMENT EVICTION BOOK 19133 PAGE 2057-2057

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; DEFAULT (CT I) AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1 N/K/A JASON HICKOX & UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT/WRIT OF POSS/MIL AFF/PROOF OF CLAIM , AND AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE AGAINST UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1 NKA JASON HICKOX, AND UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) (CT I) AS TO UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1 N/K/A JASON HICKOX & UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS (CT I) ON UNKNOWN TENANT 2; SUBSTITUTE SERVED ON 2/6/20 @ 1:40PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/25/2020; RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS (CT I) ON UNKNOWN TENANT 1 N/K/A JASON HICKOX; INDIVIDUALLY SERVED ON 2/6/20 @ 1:40PM

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $347.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3603123

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; CIVIL COMPLAINT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 2 (CTII)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1 (CTII)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING UNKNOWN OCCUPANT 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; COMPLAINT FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edwards, Meghan Elizabeth