Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 01/28/2021 at 19:42:34 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA VS AUGUSTA M RODELY Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/28/2020 BANK OF AMERICA NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against AUGUSTA M RODELY. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA NA

6409 Congress Avenue

Boca Raton, FL 33487

Defendants

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF AUGUSTA M. RODELY AKA AUGUSTA

Jacksonville, FL 33487

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETA

400 N Tampa St Suite 3200 C O Us Attorney Middle District Of Florida

Tampa, FL 33060

AUGUSTA M RODELY

Jacksonville, FL 32221

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brimm, Gweneth M

1571 Sawgrass Corporate Pkwy Ste 400

Sunrise, FL 33323-2863

 

Court Documents

CASE FEES PAID: $936.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3626717

10/29/2020- D29- CASE FEES PAID: $936.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3626717

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF NOTICE /ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/31/2020- D20- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF NOTICE /ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM OTHER BEFORE HEARING

3/18/2020- D19- FINAL DISPOSITION FORM OTHER BEFORE HEARING

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS

3/18/2020- D18- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE AUGUSTA M. RODELY ON 3-9-20 @ 7 PM

3/18/2020- D16- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE AUGUSTA M. RODELY ON 3-9-20 @ 7 PM

COMPLAINT

2/28/2020- D5- COMPLAINT

CERTIFICATE OF NOTE POSSESSION

2/28/2020- D4- CERTIFICATE OF NOTE POSSESSION

COVER SHEET

2/28/2020- D1- COVER SHEET

CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE 05/05/2020 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

3/2/2020- D12- CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE 05/05/2020 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

CASE FEES PAID: $1,076.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3626717

2/28/2020- D10- CASE FEES PAID: $1,076.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3626717

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19125 PAGE 1023-1024

2/28/2020- D3- NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19125 PAGE 1023-1024

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

2/28/2020- D2- VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : REFUNDCHECK; Assessed : $140.00; Paid : $140.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/29/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $936.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3626717

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/29/2020; RECEIPT NUMBER 3626717 HAD A REFUND OF $140.00 AMOUNT SENT TO ROBERTSON ANSCHUTZ & SCHNEID, PL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/29/2020; RECEIPT NUMBER 3626717 REVISED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : Case Management Reschedule; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 510

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/8/2020; CASE MANAGEMENT RESCHEDULE 07/21/2020 9:00 AM - 510 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/8/2020; > CANCEL REASON - PER ADMIN. ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/8/2020; CANCELLED CASE MANAGMENT CONFERENCE ON 5/5/2020 9:00:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/1/2020; ORDER SETTING CASE FOR STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketEntered: 6/1/2020; ORDER SETTING CASE FOR STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $1,076.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3626717

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2020; HOMESTEAD RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE - $50,001 - $249,999

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNONW SPOUSE OF AUGUSTA M. RODELY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED USA ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED AUGUSTA M. RODELY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2020; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2020; CERTIFICATE OF NOTE POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2020; NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 19125 PAGE 1023-1024

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2020; VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/2/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Unite States of America Dept of Treasury is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brimm, Gweneth M, ESQ.