This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 09/26/2020 at 00:10:44 (UTC).

BACK IN BALANCE A/A/O MARIE LENDRUM VS PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 BACK IN BALANCE A/A/O MARIE LENDRUM filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUTH, JAMES A.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUTH, JAMES A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BACK IN BALANCE A/A/O MARIE LENDRUM

St Augustine, FL 32085

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

600 North Westshore Blvd Ste 500

Tampa, FL 33609

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Owens, Donald Ray III

Po Box 3747

Saint Augustine, FL 32085-3747

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (PLAINTIFF'S)

5/6/2020- D15- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (PLAINTIFF'S)

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

4/27/2020- D11- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

SUMMONS ISSUED PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

2/20/2020- D10- SUMMONS ISSUED PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3617788

2/20/2020- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3617788

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY) - PLAINTIFF

2/18/2020- D6- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY) - PLAINTIFF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST)

2/18/2020- D5- REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES /PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET TO THE DEFENDANT - PLAINTIFF

2/18/2020- D4- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES /PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET TO THE DEFENDANT - PLAINTIFF

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST)

2/18/2020- D3- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST)

COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

2/18/2020- D2- COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET - PLAINTIFF

2/18/2020- D1- COVER SHEET - PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketEntered: 5/7/2020; > CANCEL REASON - DISMISSAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketEntered: 5/7/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 6/26/2020 9:00:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/7/2020; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (PLAINTIFF'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 06/26/2020 9:00 AM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; > CANCEL REASON - RESCHEDULING DUE TO COVID-19 OR BK19179 PG1359

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 4/2/2020 1:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS; Assessed : $55.00; Paid : $55.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 04/02/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3617788

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $0 - $100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY) - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES /PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET TO THE DEFENDANT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT (PLAINTIFF'S FIRST)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; COVER SHEET - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less