This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 08/23/2020 at 00:46:55 (UTC).

AXXESS THERAPY A/A/O CHASE OWENS VS PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/05/2020 AXXESS THERAPY A/A/O CHASE OWENS filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HIGBEE, RONALD P.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HIGBEE, RONALD P.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AXXESS THERAPY A/A/O CHASE OWENS

St. Augustine, FL 32085

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

600 North Westshore Blvd Suite 500

Tampa, FL 33609

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Owens, Donald Ray III

Po Box 3747

Saint Augustine, FL 32085-3747

Defendant Attorney

Love-Lane, Rhamen Malique

390 N Orange Ave Ste 2100

Orlando, FL 32801-1642

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

4/3/2020- D19- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE -DEFENDANT, TO PLAINTIFF

3/23/2020- D18- REQUEST TO PRODUCE -DEFENDANT, TO PLAINTIFF

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT'S)

3/23/2020- D17- RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT'S)

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

3/23/2020- D16- ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

3/18/2020- D14- ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL RHAMEN LOVE-LANE FOR PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY -DEFENDANT

3/18/2020- D15- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL RHAMEN LOVE-LANE FOR PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY -DEFENDANT

SUMMONS ISSUED PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

2/7/2020- D10- SUMMONS ISSUED PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

2/5/2020- D6- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S) FIRST TO DEFENDANT

2/5/2020- D5- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S) FIRST TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S) FIRST SET TO THE DEFENDANT

2/5/2020- D4- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S) FIRST SET TO THE DEFENDANT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S) FIRST TO DEFENDANT

2/5/2020- D3- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S) FIRST TO DEFENDANT

COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

2/5/2020- D2- COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

2/5/2020- D1- COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3610883

2/5/2020- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3610883

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/7/2020; > CANCEL REASON - DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/7/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 4/28/2020 1:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/7/2020; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/23/2020; REQUEST TO PRODUCE -DEFENDANT, TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/23/2020; RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/23/2020; ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL RHAMEN LOVE-LANE FOR PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY -DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/18/2020; ORDER RESCHEDULING CASE FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/7/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/7/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 03/19/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/7/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3610883

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/7/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $0 - $100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/7/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/7/2020; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S) FIRST TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/7/2020; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S) FIRST SET TO THE DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/7/2020; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S) FIRST TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/7/2020; COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/7/2020; COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less