Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 01/29/2021 at 05:17:51 (UTC).

AUSTIN L GAYLE VS HAILEY A HART

Case Summary

On 03/17/2020 AUSTIN L GAYLE filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against HAILEY A HART. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is COOPER, WCOLLINS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

COOPER, WCOLLINS

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AUSTIN L GAYLE

Jacksonville, FL 32244

Respondent

HAILEY A HART

Jacksonville, FL 32222

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Oberdorfer, Douglas Aaron

432 E Monroe St

Jacksonville, FL 32202-2837

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING MOTION (PETITIONER'S), FOR SCIENTIFIC PATERNITY TESTING

6/26/2020- D18- ORDER GRANTING MOTION (PETITIONER'S), FOR SCIENTIFIC PATERNITY TESTING

NOTICE OF HEARING 06/26/2020 11:15 AM VIA ZOOM

6/8/2020- D17- NOTICE OF HEARING 06/26/2020 11:15 AM VIA ZOOM

MOTION FOR SCIENTIFIC PATERNITY TESTING/ AUSTIN L. GAYLE/ATTY

5/20/2020- D16- MOTION FOR SCIENTIFIC PATERNITY TESTING/ AUSTIN L. GAYLE/ATTY

ANSWER TO PETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY AND FOR RELATED RELIEF/HAILEY AMANDA HART

4/15/2020- D15- ANSWER TO PETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY AND FOR RELATED RELIEF/HAILEY AMANDA HART

UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION & ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT /HAILEY AMANDA HART

4/15/2020- D14- UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION & ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT /HAILEY AMANDA HART

FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT /HAILEY AMANDA HART

4/15/2020- D13- FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT /HAILEY AMANDA HART

CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE /HAILEY AMANDA HART

4/15/2020- D12- CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE /HAILEY AMANDA HART

NOTICE OF RELATED CASES /LINKED

4/15/2020- D11- NOTICE OF RELATED CASES /LINKED

CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET

4/15/2020- D10- CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET

NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER /HAILEY AMANDA HART

4/15/2020- D9- NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER /HAILEY AMANDA HART

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS HAILEY A HART SERVED 03/25/2020 12:30 PM

4/3/2020- D8- RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS HAILEY A HART SERVED 03/25/2020 12:30 PM

UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION & ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT /AUSTIN L GAYLE/ATTY

3/23/2020- D7- UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION & ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT /AUSTIN L GAYLE/ATTY

SUMMONS ISSUED TO HAILEY A HART

3/17/2020- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED TO HAILEY A HART

NOTICE OF RELATED CASES (LINKED)

3/17/2020- D3- NOTICE OF RELATED CASES (LINKED)

COVER SHEET

3/17/2020- D1- COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DETERMINATION OF PATERNITY - AUSTIN GAYLE / ATTY

3/17/2020- D2- COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DETERMINATION OF PATERNITY - AUSTIN GAYLE / ATTY

CASE FEES PAID: $311.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3640192

3/16/2020- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $311.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3640192

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/26/2020; ORDER GRANTING MOTION (PETITIONER'S), FOR SCIENTIFIC PATERNITY TESTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/8/2020; NOTICE OF HEARING 06/26/2020 11:15 AM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/20/2020; MOTION FOR SCIENTIFIC PATERNITY TESTING/ AUSTIN L. GAYLE/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/19/2020; ANSWER TO PETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY AND FOR RELATED RELIEF/HAILEY AMANDA HART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/19/2020; UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION & ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT /HAILEY AMANDA HART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/19/2020; FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT /HAILEY AMANDA HART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/19/2020; CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE /HAILEY AMANDA HART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/19/2020; NOTICE OF RELATED CASES /LINKED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/19/2020; CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/19/2020; NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER /HAILEY AMANDA HART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/3/2020; RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS HAILEY A HART SERVED 03/25/2020 12:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/23/2020; UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION & ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT /AUSTIN L GAYLE/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/FAMILY LAW 7/1/2019; Assessed : $301.00; Paid : $301.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/19/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO HAILEY A HART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/19/2020; NOTICE OF RELATED CASES (LINKED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/19/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/19/2020; PATERNITY/DISESTABLISHMENT OF PATERNITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/19/2020; COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DETERMINATION OF PATERNITY - AUSTIN GAYLE / ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/19/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $311.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3640192

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Oberdorfer, Douglas Aaron