This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/28/2021 at 17:37:53 (UTC).

ATM HEALTHCARE, INC INTERVENTIONAL PAIN SOLUTIONS AS ASSIGNEE OF FEDERICO EMATA JACILA VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/28/2020 ATM HEALTHCARE, INC INTERVENTIONAL PAIN SOLUTIONS AS ASSIGNEE OF FEDERICO EMATA JACILA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SALEM, R ANTHONY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SALEM, R ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ATM HEALTHCARE, INC INTERVENTIONAL PAIN SOLUTIONS AS ASSIGNEE OF FEDERICO EMATA JACILA

10245 Centurion Parkway N 305

Jacksonville, FL 32256

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E.Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Saben, Adam B

10245 Centurion Pkwy N Ste 109

Jacksonville, FL 32256-0569

Defendant Attorney

Gagnon, David Michael

50 N Laura St Ste 3500

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3663

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR AN IN CAMERA INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS LISTED IN DEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE LOG AND MOTION TO OVERRULE DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION- PLAINTIFF

12/1/2020- D23- MOTION FOR AN IN CAMERA INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS LISTED IN DEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE LOG AND MOTION TO OVERRULE DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION- PLAINTIFF

PRIVILEGE LOG - DEFENDANT

6/1/2020- D22- PRIVILEGE LOG - DEFENDANT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (FIRST)- DEFENDANT

6/1/2020- D21- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (FIRST)- DEFENDANT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS /PLAINTIFF'S FIRST (DEFENDANT'S)

5/26/2020- D20- RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS /PLAINTIFF'S FIRST (DEFENDANT'S)

NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS - PLAINTIFF

4/24/2020- D19- NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS - PLAINTIFF

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT

4/24/2020- D18- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT

4/24/2020- D17- REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (PLAINTIFF'S) DEFENDANT'S

4/24/2020- D16- REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (PLAINTIFF'S) DEFENDANT'S

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFENDANT'S)

4/6/2020- D15- ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFENDANT'S)

ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

3/11/2020- D12- ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

STIPULATION (JOINT) WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE- PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT

3/11/2020- D11- STIPULATION (JOINT) WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE- PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT

MOTION TO INVOKE (DEFENDANT'S) THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

3/10/2020- D10- MOTION TO INVOKE (DEFENDANT'S) THE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DAVID GAGNON FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

3/5/2020- D9- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DAVID GAGNON FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DAVID GAGNON FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (DEFENDANT'S) AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

2/20/2020- D8- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DAVID GAGNON FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (DEFENDANT'S) AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, PLAINTIFF'S

1/28/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, PLAINTIFF'S

COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S

1/28/2020- D1- COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S

COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF'S

1/28/2020- D2- COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF'S

CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3603470

1/28/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3603470

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/2/2020; MOTION FOR AN IN CAMERA INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS LISTED IN DEFENDANT'S PRIVILEGE LOG AND MOTION TO OVERRULE DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION- PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/2/2020; PRIVILEGE LOG - DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/2/2020; RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (FIRST)- DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/26/2020; RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS /PLAINTIFF'S FIRST (DEFENDANT'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S) TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/27/2020; REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (PLAINTIFF'S) DEFENDANT'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/9/2020; ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFENDANT'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/20/2020; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL DAVID GAGNON FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (DEFENDANT'S) AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS>$500/=; Assessed : $175.00; Paid : $175.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 03/12/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3603470

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $501 - $2,500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; COVER SHEET PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ATM HEALTHCARE, INC. DBA INJURY CARE CENTERS AS ASSIGNEE OF CHERYL FALLON is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Saben, Adam B