This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 08/16/2020 at 00:32:43 (UTC).

ALYSSA NOBRIGA Et Al VS PATMILT INC

Case Summary

On 02/25/2020 ALYSSA NOBRIGA filed an Other lawsuit against PATMILT INC. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NORTON, VIRGINIA B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NORTON, VIRGINIA B.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PAOLA CANAS

Miami, FL 33130

JESSICA GOLDEN

Miami, FL 33130

JESSICA BURCIAGA

Miami, FL 33130

URSULA SANCHEZ

Miami, FL 33130

AMBER LANCASTER

Miami, FL 33130

MARKETA KAZDOVA

Miami, FL 33130

BRENDA LYNN GEIGER

Miami, FL 33130

RACHEL BERNSTEIN KOREN

Miami, FL 33130

LINA POSADA

Miami, FL 33130

DESSIE MITCHESON

Miami, FL 33130

ALYSSA NOBRIGA

Miami, FL 33130

MASHA LUND

Miami, FL 33130

JESSICA HINTON

Miami, FL 33130

ROSA ACOSTA

Miami, FL 33130

IRINA VORONINA

Miami, FL 33130

EVA PEPAJ

Miami, FL 33130

HILLARY FISHER VINSON

Miami, FL 33130

Defendant

PATMILT INC

9801 Beach Blvd

Jacksonville, FL 32246

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Khomiak, Ludmila

80 Sw 8Th St Ste 2000

Miami, FL 33130-3038

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE (CORP) PATMILT INC ON 6-17-30 @ 10:58 AM

6/18/2020- D7- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE (CORP) PATMILT INC ON 6-17-30 @ 10:58 AM

SUMMONS ISSUED TO PATMILT, INC D/B/A PASSIONS GENTLEMEN'S CLUB D/B/A PASSIONS BAR JAX D/B/A PASSIONS JAX D/B/A PASSIONS SHOW BAR

2/25/2020- D2- SUMMONS ISSUED TO PATMILT, INC D/B/A PASSIONS GENTLEMEN'S CLUB D/B/A PASSIONS BAR JAX D/B/A PASSIONS JAX D/B/A PASSIONS SHOW BAR

COMPLAINT

2/25/2020- D3- COMPLAINT

CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3622041

2/25/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3622041

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/9/2020; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTFS. FIRST) OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFT. PATMILT, INC. D/B/A PASSIONS GENTLEMEN'S CLUB DBA PASSIONS BAR JAX DBA PASSIONS JAX DBA PASSIONS SHOWBAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/9/2020; INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT (PLAINTIFFS FIRST) PATMILT, INC. DBA PASSIONS GENTLEMEN'S CLUB DBA PASSIONS BAR JAX DBA PASSIONS JAX DBA PASSIONS SHOWBAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketEntered: 7/7/2020; ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES -DEFT MOTION TO DISMISS, TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/19/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE (CORP) PATMILT INC ON 6-17-30 @ 10:58 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CIR/GENERALCIVIL 7/1/2019; Assessed : $401.00; Paid : $401.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3622041

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED TO PATMILT, INC D/B/A PASSIONS GENTLEMEN'S CLUB D/B/A PASSIONS BAR JAX D/B/A PASSIONS JAX D/B/A PASSIONS SHOW BAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less