This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/29/2021 at 01:44:56 (UTC).

ALLIED HEALTH AND REHAB, CO. A/A/O KATESHA AUSTIN VS PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 ALLIED HEALTH AND REHAB, CO A/A/O KATESHA AUSTIN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PERRY, ERIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PERRY, ERIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLIED HEALTH AND REHAB, CO. A/A/O KATESHA AUSTIN

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Suite 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

P.O Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gudin, Gregory Edward

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Ste 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323-2856

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (PLAINTIFF'S)

3/31/2020- D9- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (PLAINTIFF'S)

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ELECTRONIC DELIVERY 02/27/2020 TO DONNA MOCH FOR PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

3/26/2020- D8- NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ELECTRONIC DELIVERY 02/27/2020 TO DONNA MOCH FOR PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS ISSUED PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

2/21/2020- D7- SUMMONS ISSUED PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3618757

2/21/2020- D5- CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3618757

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY) - PLAINTIFF

2/18/2020- D3- SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY) - PLAINTIFF

COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

2/18/2020- D2- COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET - PLAINTIFF

2/18/2020- D1- COVER SHEET - PLAINTIFF

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION; Location : Jury Assembly Room 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 2379;Cancelled: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/1/2020; > CANCEL REASON - DISMISSAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketEntered: 4/1/2020; CANCELLED NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION ON 4/2/2020 1:30:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/1/2020; NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (PLAINTIFF'S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/26/2020; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS ELECTRONIC DELIVERY 02/27/2020 TO DONNA MOCH FOR PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/CLAIMS>$500/=; Assessed : $175.00; Paid : $175.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 04/02/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $185.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3618757

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $501 - $2,500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY) - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; COVER SHEET - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIED HEALTH & REHAB, CO. F/K/A MARIANNA HEALTH & REHAB, CO. AS ASSIGNEE OF SHARON MORERA is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gudin, Gregory E, ESQ.