This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 10/09/2020 at 15:39:54 (UTC).

ALLEGIANT MANAGEMENT LLC FOR THE OAKS ON MONUMENT VS GEOVONTE TAYLOR

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 ALLEGIANT MANAGEMENT LLC FOR THE OAKS ON MONUMENT filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against GEOVONTE TAYLOR. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RUTH, JAMES A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RUTH, JAMES A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLEGIANT MANAGEMENT LLC FOR THE OAKS ON MONUMENT

C/O Dale G. Westling, Sr., Esquire 331 E Union St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendant

GEOVONTE TAYLOR

Jacksonville, FL 32225

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Westling, Dale Gregory

331 Union St E Ste 2A

Jacksonville, FL 32202-2795

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS FOR GEOVONTE TAYLOR

9/28/2020- D8- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS FOR GEOVONTE TAYLOR

UNABLE TO ISSUE CERT. OF MAILING TO BE ISSUED AT A LATER DATE FOR GEOVANTE TAYLOR

9/25/2020- D7- UNABLE TO ISSUE CERT. OF MAILING TO BE ISSUED AT A LATER DATE FOR GEOVANTE TAYLOR

COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

9/25/2020- D4- COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR GEOVANTE TAYLOR

9/25/2020- D3- SUMMONS ISSUED FOR GEOVANTE TAYLOR

COVER SHEET (CIVIL)

9/25/2020- D1- COVER SHEET (CIVIL)

CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723273

9/25/2020- D6- CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723273

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR GEOVONTE TAYLOR

9/25/2020- D2- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR GEOVONTE TAYLOR

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/5/2020; AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF REGARDING FEDERAL CARES ACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/5/2020; AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF REGARDING CDC ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS FOR GEOVONTE TAYLOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed : $3.50; Paid : $3.50; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : SUMMONS($10/ea) 6/17/2017; Assessed : $10.00; Paid : $10.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; UNABLE TO ISSUE CERT. OF MAILING TO BE ISSUED AT A LATER DATE FOR GEOVANTE TAYLOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723273

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED FOR GEOVANTE TAYLOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR GEOVONTE TAYLOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COVER SHEET (CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less