This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 10/09/2020 at 15:32:17 (UTC).

ALLEGIANT MANAGEMENT LLC FOR THE OAKS ON MONUMENT VS AIDEN FOSTER Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 ALLEGIANT MANAGEMENT LLC FOR THE OAKS ON MONUMENT filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against AIDEN FOSTER. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORAN, JOHN A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORAN, JOHN A.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLEGIANT MANAGEMENT LLC FOR THE OAKS ON MONUMENT

C/O Dale G. Westling, Sr., Esquire 331 E Union St

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendants

NATHANIEL FOSTER

Jacksonville, FL 32225

AIDEN FOSTER

Jacksonville, FL 32225

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Westling, Dale Gregory

331 Union St E Ste 2A

Jacksonville, FL 32202-2795

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON NATHANIEL FOSTER; POSTED SERVED ON 9/29/2020 @ 2:40PM

9/30/2020- D15- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON NATHANIEL FOSTER; POSTED SERVED ON 9/29/2020 @ 2:40PM

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON AIDEN FOSTER; POSTED SERVED ON 9/29/2020 @ 2:40PM

9/30/2020- D14- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON AIDEN FOSTER; POSTED SERVED ON 9/29/2020 @ 2:40PM

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS FOR NATHANIEL FOSTER

9/28/2020- D12- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS FOR NATHANIEL FOSTER

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS FOR AIDEN FOSTER

9/28/2020- D11- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS FOR AIDEN FOSTER

UNABLE TO ISSUE CERT. OF MAILING TO BE ISSUED AT A LATER DATE FOR NATHANIEL FOSTER

9/25/2020- D10- UNABLE TO ISSUE CERT. OF MAILING TO BE ISSUED AT A LATER DATE FOR NATHANIEL FOSTER

UNABLE TO ISSUE CERT. OF MAILING TO BE ISSUED AT A LATER DATE FOR AIDEN FOSTER

9/25/2020- D9- UNABLE TO ISSUE CERT. OF MAILING TO BE ISSUED AT A LATER DATE FOR AIDEN FOSTER

COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

9/25/2020- D6- COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR NATHANIEL FOSTER

9/25/2020- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED FOR NATHANIEL FOSTER

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR AIDEN FOSTER

9/25/2020- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED FOR AIDEN FOSTER

COVER SHEET (CIVIL)

9/25/2020- D1- COVER SHEET (CIVIL)

CASE FEES PAID: $212.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723299

9/25/2020- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $212.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723299

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR NATHANIEL FOSTER

9/25/2020- D3- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR NATHANIEL FOSTER

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR AIDEN FOSTER

9/25/2020- D2- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR AIDEN FOSTER

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/9/2020; COPY OF MAILED SUMMONS & COMPLAINT RETURNED NOT DELIVERED FOR NATHANIEL FOSTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/5/2020; AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF REGARDING FEDERAL CARES ACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/5/2020; AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF REGARDING CDC ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/2/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON NATHANIEL FOSTER; POSTED SERVED ON 9/29/2020 @ 2:40PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/2/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON AIDEN FOSTER; POSTED SERVED ON 9/29/2020 @ 2:40PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS FOR NATHANIEL FOSTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/28/2020; CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS FOR AIDEN FOSTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed : $3.50; Paid : $3.50; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CO/REMOVAL OF TENANT ACTION; Assessed : $185.00; Paid : $185.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; Assessed : $3.50; Paid : $3.50; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; UNABLE TO ISSUE CERT. OF MAILING TO BE ISSUED AT A LATER DATE FOR NATHANIEL FOSTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; UNABLE TO ISSUE CERT. OF MAILING TO BE ISSUED AT A LATER DATE FOR AIDEN FOSTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $212.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3723299

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED FOR NATHANIEL FOSTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED FOR AIDEN FOSTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR NATHANIEL FOSTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR AIDEN FOSTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; COVER SHEET (CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less