This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 01/29/2021 at 01:37:35 (UTC).

ADVANCED IMAGING CENTER A/A/O THOMAS BLAIR III VS STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 ADVANCED IMAGING CENTER A/A/O THOMAS BLAIR III filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KALIL, MICHELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KALIL, MICHELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADVANCED IMAGING CENTER A/A/O THOMAS BLAIR III

Po Box 3747

St. Augustine, FL 32085

Defendant

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Po Box 106140

Atlanta, GA 30348

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Owens, Donald Ray III

Po Box 3747

Saint Augustine, FL 32085-3747

Defendant Attorney

Satin, Jacob Michael

250 S Orange Ave Ste 600

Orlando, FL 32801-3443

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING SET FOR 01/19/2021 @ 10:30AM

1/8/2021- D29- NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING SET FOR 01/19/2021 @ 10:30AM

NOTICE OF HEARING (SET UNILATERALLY) 1/19/21 @ 10:30 A.M. WITH MICHELLE KALIL, 501 WEST ADAMS STREET, JACKSONVILLE, FL 32202

11/19/2020- D28- NOTICE OF HEARING (SET UNILATERALLY) 1/19/21 @ 10:30 A.M. WITH MICHELLE KALIL, 501 WEST ADAMS STREET, JACKSONVILLE, FL 32202

MOTION (DEFENDANT'S) TO ENFORCE ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES

10/9/2020- D27- MOTION (DEFENDANT'S) TO ENFORCE ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES

NOTICE OF HEARING 09/16/2020 @ 2:15PM TELEPHONICALLY

8/25/2020- D25- NOTICE OF HEARING 09/16/2020 @ 2:15PM TELEPHONICALLY

MOTION TO COMPEL DICOVERY RESPONSES- DEFENDANT

7/13/2020- D24- MOTION TO COMPEL DICOVERY RESPONSES- DEFENDANT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT'S) PLAINTIFF'S FIRST

5/4/2020- D21- RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT'S) PLAINTIFF'S FIRST

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S) PLAINTIFF

5/4/2020- D20- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S) PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT'S) PLAINTIFF'S FIRST

5/4/2020- D19- NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT'S) PLAINTIFF'S FIRST

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S)

4/21/2020- D17- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS -DEFENDANT, LAW FIRM OF MIMI L SMITH NEW ADDRESS, 390 N ORANGE AVE, #1700, ORLANDO, FL 32801

3/19/2020- D16- NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS -DEFENDANT, LAW FIRM OF MIMI L SMITH NEW ADDRESS, 390 N ORANGE AVE, #1700, ORLANDO, FL 32801

STIPULATION (JOINT) OF WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - BOTH PARTIES

3/13/2020- D15- STIPULATION (JOINT) OF WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE - BOTH PARTIES

ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

3/13/2020- D12- ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JACOB SATIN FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY -DEFENDANT, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL

3/11/2020- D11- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JACOB SATIN FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY -DEFENDANT, AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL

SUMMONS ISSUED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

2/19/2020- D10- SUMMONS ISSUED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S) FIRST TO DEFENDANT

2/18/2020- D5- REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S) FIRST TO DEFENDANT

COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

2/18/2020- D2- COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

2/18/2020- D1- COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3617346

2/17/2020- D8- CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3617346

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/14/2021; NOTICE OF HEARING ON 03/02/2021 @ 10:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/11/2021; NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING SET FOR 01/19/2021 @ 10:30AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 11/23/2020; NOTICE OF HEARING (SET UNILATERALLY) 1/19/21 @ 10:30 A.M. WITH MICHELLE KALIL, 501 WEST ADAMS STREET, JACKSONVILLE, FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/12/2020; MOTION (DEFENDANT'S) TO ENFORCE ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/18/2020; ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES - PLAINTIFF'S SHALL HAVE 20 DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/25/2020; NOTICE OF HEARING 09/16/2020 @ 2:15PM TELEPHONICALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 7/14/2020; MOTION TO COMPEL DICOVERY RESPONSES- DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/5/2020; LETTER TO PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY - DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/6/2020; PRIVILEGE LOG - DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 5/5/2020; RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (DEFENDANT'S) PLAINTIFF'S FIRST

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; NOTICE TO APPEAR (ATTORNEY) FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE/MEDIATION 04/02/2020 1:30 PM - 2379 JURY ASSEMBLY ROOM 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; COMPLAINT ON CONTRACT OR OTHER DEBT - $0 - $100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S) FIRST TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S) FIRST SET TO THE DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLAINTIFF'S) FIRST TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; COMPLAINT - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; COVER SHEET CIVIL - PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/19/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $65.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3617346

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADVANCED IMAGING CENTER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Owens, Donald Ray III