Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 01/29/2021 at 05:20:20 (UTC).

ABRAHAM I BATEH Et Al VS LUIS APONTE

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 ABRAHAM I BATEH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LUIS APONTE. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GUY, JOHN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GUY, JOHN

 

Party Details

Petitioners

KELLY D APONTE

Jacksonville, FL 32223

ABRAHAM I BATEH

Jacksonville, FL 32207

Respondent

LUIS APONTE

Jacksonville, FL 32223

Not Classified By Court

Mediator

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Bateh, Abraham Issa

4229 Atlantic Blvd

Jacksonville, FL 32207-2040

Respondent Attorney

Visali, Heather Lynn

2950 Halcyon Ln Ste 305

Jacksonville, FL 32223-6691

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Lordahl, Joy A

3840 Williamsburg Park Blvd

Jacksonville, FL 32257-9227

 

Court Documents

NOTICE (SECOND), OF PRODUCTION ATY/FOR HUSBAND

10/22/2020- D46- NOTICE (SECOND), OF PRODUCTION ATY/FOR HUSBAND

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION/LUIS APONTE/ATTY

10/14/2020- D45- NOTICE OF PRODUCTION/LUIS APONTE/ATTY

ORDER SETTING CASE FOR NON-JURY TRIAL AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE- 02/04/2021 @ 10:00 AM TRIAL- 02/08/2021

8/10/2020- D43- ORDER SETTING CASE FOR NON-JURY TRIAL AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE- 02/04/2021 @ 10:00 AM TRIAL- 02/08/2021

CFID-CERTIFICATE /LUIS APONTE

7/31/2020- D41- CFID-CERTIFICATE /LUIS APONTE

FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (LONG FORM) FOR LUIS APONTE

7/30/2020- D40- FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT (LONG FORM) FOR LUIS APONTE

UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION & ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT - LUIS APONTE

7/29/2020- D39- UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION & ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT - LUIS APONTE

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE OF ODCUMENTS - LUIS APONTE / ATTY

7/8/2020- D35- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE OF ODCUMENTS - LUIS APONTE / ATTY

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (WIFIE'S) TO (HUSBAND'S) - LUIS APONTE / FROM: KELLY D. APONTE - ABRAHAM I. BATEH, ESQ.

7/8/2020- D34- RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (WIFIE'S) TO (HUSBAND'S) - LUIS APONTE / FROM: KELLY D. APONTE - ABRAHAM I. BATEH, ESQ.

NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER WITH CHILDREN (AMENDED)

6/24/2020- D33- NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER WITH CHILDREN (AMENDED)

REQUEST FOR COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO RULE 12.285 - LUIS APONTE / ATTY

5/29/2020- D24- REQUEST FOR COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE PURSUANT TO RULE 12.285 - LUIS APONTE / ATTY

COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF AMRRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF/ KELLY D. APONTE/ATTY

3/18/2020- D7- COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF AMRRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF/ KELLY D. APONTE/ATTY

CFID-CERTIFICATE /KELLY APONTE

6/16/2020- D31- CFID-CERTIFICATE /KELLY APONTE

CASE FEES PAID: $295.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3669452

5/29/2020- D26- CASE FEES PAID: $295.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3669452

NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER WITH CHILDREN - LUIS APONTE

5/29/2020- D23- NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER WITH CHILDREN - LUIS APONTE

NOTICE OF RELATED CASES (NONE)

5/29/2020- D22- NOTICE OF RELATED CASES (NONE)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL HEATHER VISALI FOR LUIS APONTE

5/29/2020- D20- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL HEATHER VISALI FOR LUIS APONTE

CASE FEES PAID: $419.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3639958

3/18/2020- D15- CASE FEES PAID: $419.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3639958

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ABRAHAM BATEH FOR KELLY APONTE

3/18/2020- D5- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ABRAHAM BATEH FOR KELLY APONTE

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketEntered: 1/15/2021; CHECKLIST FOR UNCONTESTED DIVORCES (4TH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT) (DIVISION FM-C)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketEntered: 1/15/2021; CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE BOOK 19544 PAGE 27-48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketEntered: 12/4/2020; NOTICE OF HEARING (FINAL) 01/14/2021 9:00 AM VIA ZOOM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketEntered: 12/4/2020; AFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS /KELLY D APONTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketEntered: 11/9/2020; DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE /AGREEMENT SIGNED-TOTAL RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/26/2020; NOTICE (SECOND), OF PRODUCTION ATY/FOR HUSBAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/16/2020; NOTICE OF PRODUCTION/LUIS APONTE/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketEntered: 8/12/2020; MEMORANDUM (TRIAL SET) WEEK OF 02/08/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/11/2020; ORDER SETTING CASE FOR NON-JURY TRIAL AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE- 02/04/2021 @ 10:00 AM TRIAL- 02/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/5/2020; CONSENT ORDER ON WIFE'S REQUEST FOR OCCUPATIONAL/VOCATIONAL EVALUATION OF HUSBAND

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/19/2020; MOTION FOR TEMPORARY NEEDS & FACULTIES / KELLY D. APONTE/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/19/2020; NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/19/2020; NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ABRAHAM BATEH FOR KELLY APONTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/19/2020; NOTICE OF RELATED CASES -NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/19/2020; STANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/19/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/19/2020; COMPLAINT/PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF AMRRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF/ KELLY D. APONTE/ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/19/2020; DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/15/2021; ATTY. FOR RESPONDENT: VISALI, HEATHER LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/15/2021; ATTY. FOR PETITIONER: BATEH, ABRAHAM ISSA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mediator is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lordahl, Joy A