This case was last updated from Duval County Courts on 07/10/2020 at 14:25:00 (UTC).

2018-2 IH BORROWER LP VS LOIS BENCIVENNI Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/24/2020 2018-2 IH BORROWER LP filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against LOIS BENCIVENNI. This case was filed in Duval County Courts, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DERKE, ELENI ELIA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Duval County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DERKE, ELENI ELIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

2018-2 IH BORROWER LP

7751 Belfort Parkway, Ste. 100

Jacksonville, FL 32256

Defendants

THOMAS BENCIVENNI

Jacksonville, FL 32223

RACHELLE SLOAN

Jacksonville, FL 32223

LOIS BENCIVENNI

Jacksonville, FL 32223

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Siegel, Matthew Edward

Clearwater, Fl 33761 2753 State Road 580 Ste 209

Clearwater, FL 33761-3345

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED 03/09/2020 09:30AM EXECUTED, THOMAS BENCIVENNI, RACHELLE SLOAN AND LOIS BENCIVENNI

3/10/2020- D25- WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED 03/09/2020 09:30AM EXECUTED, THOMAS BENCIVENNI, RACHELLE SLOAN AND LOIS BENCIVENNI

RETURNED MAIL-UNDELIVERABLE -FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION FOR RACHELLE SLOAN

3/3/2020- D24- RETURNED MAIL-UNDELIVERABLE -FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION FOR RACHELLE SLOAN

CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3622639

2/26/2020- D23- CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3622639

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

2/25/2020- D22- WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT -FILED BY PTLF

2/10/2020- D19- MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT -FILED BY PTLF

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 01/30/20, @1:36PM, TO RACHELLE SLOAN, POSTED

2/10/2020- D17- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 01/30/20, @1:36PM, TO RACHELLE SLOAN, POSTED

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 01/30/20, @1:36PM TO LOIS BENCIVENNI, POSTED

2/10/2020- D16- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 01/30/20, @1:36PM TO LOIS BENCIVENNI, POSTED

SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 01/30/20, @1:36PM, TO THOMAS BENCIVENNI. POSTED

2/10/2020- D15- SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 01/30/20, @1:36PM, TO THOMAS BENCIVENNI. POSTED

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR THOMAS BENCIVENNI, RACHELLE SLOAN & LOIS BENCIVENNI

2/10/2020- D14- NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR THOMAS BENCIVENNI, RACHELLE SLOAN & LOIS BENCIVENNI

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO RACHELLE SLOAN

1/28/2020- D12- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO RACHELLE SLOAN

CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO THOMAS BENCIVENNI

1/28/2020- D11- CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO THOMAS BENCIVENNI

CASE FEES PAID: $225.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3602962

1/28/2020- D10- CASE FEES PAID: $225.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3602962

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RACHELLE SLOAN

1/24/2020- D8- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RACHELLE SLOAN

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING THOMAS BENCIVENNI

1/24/2020- D7- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING THOMAS BENCIVENNI

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING LOIS BENCIVENNI

1/24/2020- D6- CERTIFICATE OF MAILING LOIS BENCIVENNI

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR LOIS BENCIVENNI

1/24/2020- D5- SUMMONS ISSUED FOR LOIS BENCIVENNI

SUMMONS ISSUED FOR RACHELLE SLOAN

1/24/2020- D4- SUMMONS ISSUED FOR RACHELLE SLOAN

COVER SHEET

1/24/2020- D1- COVER SHEET

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/11/2020; WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED 03/09/2020 09:30AM EXECUTED, THOMAS BENCIVENNI, RACHELLE SLOAN AND LOIS BENCIVENNI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/4/2020; RETURNED MAIL-UNDELIVERABLE -FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION FOR RACHELLE SLOAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : WRIT OF POSSESSION; Assessed : $7.00; Paid : $7.00; Balance : $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3622639

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/26/2020; WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketEntered: 2/21/2020; FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION BOOK 19113 PAGE 2279-2279

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/12/2020; DEFAULT AGAISNT THOMAS BENCIVENNI, RACHELLE SLOAN & LOIS BENCIVENNI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/12/2020; MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT -FILED BY PTLF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/12/2020; MOTION FOR DEFAULT FOR THOMAS BENCIVENNI, RACHELLE SLOAN & LOIS BENCIVENNI -FILED BY PLTF MODIFICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 2/12/2020; SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON 01/30/20, @1:36PM, TO RACHELLE SLOAN, POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; CASE FEES PAID: $225.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3602962

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RACHELLE SLOAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING THOMAS BENCIVENNI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; CERTIFICATE OF MAILING LOIS BENCIVENNI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED FOR LOIS BENCIVENNI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED FOR RACHELLE SLOAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; SUMMONS ISSUED FOR THOMAS BENCIVENNI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 1/28/2020; COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less