This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 02/25/2021 at 04:35:35 (UTC).

ZARA FREDERICK MINCEY

Case Summary

On 03/22/2020 ZARA FREDERICK MINCEY was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BASS, LESTER B. and FELTEL JR, GILBERT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BASS, LESTER B.

FELTEL JR, GILBERT

 

Party Details

Defendant

ZARA FREDERICK MINCEY

Jacksonville, FL 32210

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Wesemann, Max A

Shumard, Gary Shane

121 W Forsyth St Ste 610

Jacksonville, FL 32202-3848

Maguire, Annie Jourdan

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

12/8/2020- D138- PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

CITATION NO. ACZKWOE AND DATE 03/21/2020

3/22/2020- D7- CITATION NO. ACZKWOE AND DATE 03/21/2020

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE SHUMARD, GARY SHANE

4/6/2020- D22- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE SHUMARD, GARY SHANE

BOND - AMOUNT $0.00, COMPANY ROR

3/23/2020- D15- BOND - AMOUNT $0.00, COMPANY ROR

BOND - AMOUNT $150,003.00, COMPANY PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

3/22/2020- D14- BOND - AMOUNT $150,003.00, COMPANY PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-006951 3/21/2020

3/22/2020- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-006951 3/21/2020

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

3/22/2020- D10- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

3/22/2020- D9- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

3/22/2020- D8- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketEntered: 12/29/2020; ORDER W/H ADJ OF GUILT AND PLACING DEF ON DRG OFFEN PROB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketEntered: 12/9/2020; SENTENCING GUIDELINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketEntered: 12/9/2020; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : DISPOSITION; Location : 4th Floor; Courtroom : 408

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • FinancialFees- Description : FELONY A/DRUG CASE FEE b 2/12/2016; Assessed : $618.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $618.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 12/9/2020; PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 12/9/2020; DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 12/9/2020; FOLLOWED BY: 18 MONTHS DRUG OFFENDER PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 12/9/2020; 3 DAYS DCJ WITH 3 DAYS CREDIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 12/9/2020; UNSUPERVISED PROBATION 3 DAYS CONCURRENT

    Read MoreRead Less
138 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2020
  • DocketEntered: 3/24/2020; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/24/2020; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/24/2020; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 3/24/2020; BOND SET AT ROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/24/2020; BOND SET AT $150,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 3/24/2020; CITATION NO. ACZKWOE AND DATE 03/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2020
  • DocketCount: 3; Entered: 3/24/2020; S316.123(2)(A) RAN STOP SIGN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2020
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 3/24/2020; S893.13(6)(A) POSSESS OVER 20 GRAMS OF MARIJUANA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 3/24/2020; S893.135(1)(F)1 TRAFFIC IN AMPHETAMINE OR METHAMPHETAMINE - 14 GRAMS OR MORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 3/24/2020; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2020-006951 3/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shumard, Gary Shane

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Maguire, Annie Jourdan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wesemann, Max A