This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/21/2022 at 00:52:43 (UTC).

ZACCHEUS URIAH RICHARDSON HILL

Case Summary

On 04/12/2022 ZACCHEUS URIAH RICHARDSON HILL was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SALEM, R ANTHONY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SALEM, R ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Defendants

ZACCHEUS URIAH RICHARDSON HILL

Jacksonville, FL 32202

ZACCHEUS URIAH RICHARDSON-HILL

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Public Defender Assigned

Jang, Ju Young

Swanson, Lydia Jane

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

4/12/2022- D6- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

4/12/2022- D7- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

4/12/2022- D8- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-009600 4/11/2022

4/12/2022- D1- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-009600 4/11/2022

MOTION FOR ADVERSARY PRELIMINARY HEARING

5/3/2022- D13- MOTION FOR ADVERSARY PRELIMINARY HEARING

MOTION FOR RELEASE DUE TO FAILURE OF THE STATE TO FILE CHARGES

5/12/2022- D18- MOTION FOR RELEASE DUE TO FAILURE OF THE STATE TO FILE CHARGES

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE TO COUNTY JAIL FOR 12 MONTHS BOOK 20325 PAGE 2421-2426

6/15/2022- D40- JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE TO COUNTY JAIL FOR 12 MONTHS BOOK 20325 PAGE 2421-2426

PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

6/15/2022- D59- PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

6/16/2022- D62- CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/16/2022; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 6th Floor; Courtroom : 605

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • FinancialFees- Description : FELONY A/DRUG CASE FEE b 3/30/2022; Assessed : $718.00; Paid : $0.00; Balance : $718.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/16/2022; SENTENCING GUIDELINES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 6/16/2022; PAYMENT AUTHORIZATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 6/16/2022; CREDIT TIME: 65 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 6/16/2022; JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE TO COUNTY JAIL FOR 12 MONTHS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 6/16/2022; DEF. ADJUDGED GUILTY - FINGERPRINTS TAKEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 6/16/2022; DEFENDANT PLEAD GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketEntered: 6/16/2022; FEES DUE: 9/13/2023

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/13/2022; FEES DUE: 4/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketEntered: 4/13/2022; PD APP FEE 50.00 IMPOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/13/2022; FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/13/2022; DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/13/2022; APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 4/13/2022; BOND SET AT $5,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 4/13/2022; BOND SET AT $10,003.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 4/13/2022; S893.13(1)(A)1 POSSESS METHAMPHETAMINE WITH THE INTENT TO SELL/MFG/DELIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 4/13/2022; S893.13(1)(A)1 SELL METHAMPHETAMINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 4/13/2022; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-009600 4/11/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Swanson, Lydia Jane

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jang, Ju Young