This case was last updated from Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/01/2022 at 03:38:23 (UTC).

WINIFRED DENISE JERIDO

Case Summary

On 08/14/2022 WINIFRED DENISE JERIDO was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Duval County - Fourth Judicial Circuit Court, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BLAZS, KEVIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BLAZS, KEVIN

 

Party Details

Defendant

WINIFRED DENISE JERIDO

Jacksonville, FL 32219

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Fallis, George Thomas

The Morris Building, 2064 Park St

Jacksonville, FL 32204-3810

Giglio, Richard James

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

8/16/2022- D11- DEFENDANT DECLARED INDIGENT, ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER - FILED

FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

8/16/2022- D14- FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ,

APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

8/16/2022- D10- APPLICATION FOR CRIMINAL INDIGENT STATUS FILED - NO DETERMINATION MADE AT THIS HEARING

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

10/27/2022- D71- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE -EMAILED

10/14/2022- D63- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE -EMAILED

INFORMATION (AMENDED)

9/20/2022- D56- INFORMATION (AMENDED)

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

9/14/2022- D52- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

ARREST & BOOKING REPORT - CONSOLIDATED ARREST AND BOOKING

8/15/2022- D33- ARREST & BOOKING REPORT - CONSOLIDATED ARREST AND BOOKING

NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

9/12/2022- D39- NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

BOND - AMOUNT $5,003.00, COMPANY PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

8/17/2022- D38- BOND - AMOUNT $5,003.00, COMPANY PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

BOND - AMOUNT $50,003.00, COMPANY PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

8/17/2022- D37- BOND - AMOUNT $50,003.00, COMPANY PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

BOND - AMOUNT $50,003.00, COMPANY PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

8/17/2022- D36- BOND - AMOUNT $50,003.00, COMPANY PALMETTO SURETY CORPORATION

CHARGES CONSOLIDATED FROM - 16-2022-CF-007905-AXXX-MA

9/6/2022- D34- CHARGES CONSOLIDATED FROM - 16-2022-CF-007905-AXXX-MA

CITATION NO. AG5GM4E AND DATE 08/13/2022

8/14/2022- D16- CITATION NO. AG5GM4E AND DATE 08/13/2022

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE AND REQUEST FOR DIVISION REASSIGNMENT TO CR-G (CIRCUIT COURT)

8/22/2022- D22- NOTICE OF RELATED CASE AND REQUEST FOR DIVISION REASSIGNMENT TO CR-G (CIRCUIT COURT)

MOTION FOR STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS

8/18/2022- D20- MOTION FOR STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS

NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

8/18/2022- D19- NOTICE OF INTENT TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FALLIS, GEORGE THOMAS

8/18/2022- D18- NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FALLIS, GEORGE THOMAS

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 508

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 10/27/2022; NOTICE TO BONDSMAN FOR UPCOMING COURT DATE EMAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 9:00 AM; Type : PRETRIAL; Location : 5th Floor; Courtroom : 508

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketEntered: 10/26/2022; PRETRIAL 11/16/2022 9:00 AM - 508 5TH FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketEntered: 10/26/2022; OTHERS PRESENT: K. CARLISLE FOR G. FALLIS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketEntered: 10/26/2022; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketEntered: 10/26/2022; ATTY. FOR DEF. FALLIS, GEORGE THOMAS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketEntered: 10/26/2022; ASST. STATE ATTY. GIGLIO, RICHARD JAMES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketEntered: 10/26/2022; SITTING JUDGE - ADAMS, GAIL ANDERSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketEntered: 10/26/2022; JUDGE BLAZS, KEVIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
56 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2022
  • DocketCount: 5; Entered: 8/16/2022; BOND SET AT $10,003.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 8/16/2022; BOND SET AT $250,003.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2022
  • DocketEntered: 8/16/2022; NO WITNESSES OR CO-DEFT CONTACT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 8/16/2022; BOND SET AT NONE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCount: 4; Entered: 8/16/2022; CITATION NO. AG5GM4E AND DATE 08/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2022
  • DocketCount: 4; Entered: 8/16/2022; S316.605(1) TAG - NONE / OBSCURED / DEFACED / IMPROPER DISPLAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2022
  • DocketCount: 5; Entered: 8/16/2022; S893.147(2) POSSESS PARAPHERNALIA FOR THE MANUFACTURE OR DELIVERY OF DRUGS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2022
  • DocketCount: 2; Entered: 8/16/2022; S893.135(5) CONSPIRE COMBINE OR CONFEDERATE WITH ANOTHER TO TRAFFIC IN COCAINE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2022
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 8/16/2022; S893.135(1)(B)1 TRAFFIC IN COCAINE - 28 GRAMS OR MORE BUT LESS THAN 150 KILOGRAMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 8/16/2022; ARREST & BOOKING REPORT 2022-021722 8/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Giglio, Richard James

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Fallis, George Thomas