This case was last updated from Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County on 10/09/2020 at 16:19:00 (UTC).

WARIO LIBAN

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 WARIO LIBAN was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County, Duval County Downtown Courthouse located in Duval, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-MA

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Fourth Circuit Courts - Duval County

  • Courthouse:

    Duval County Downtown Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Duval, Florida

 

Party Details

Defendant

WARIO LIBAN

Jacksonville, FL 32221

 

Court Documents

CITATION NO. ACPS024103 AND DATE 09/09/2020

9/25/2020- D1- CITATION NO. ACPS024103 AND DATE 09/09/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2020
  • HearingCourt Event- Time : 1:30 PM; Type : APPEARANCE DATE; Location : 2nd Floor; Courtroom : 201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketEntered: 10/8/2020; NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; APPEARANCE DATE 10/28/2020 1:30 PM - 201 2ND FLOOR, 501 W ADAMS ST JACKSONVILLE FL 32202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; CORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCount: 1; Entered: 9/25/2020; M462.203(A) FAILURE TO PROVIDE PROPER FOOD, WATER, SHELTER, OR VET CARE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntered: 9/25/2020; CITATION NO. ACPS024103 AND DATE 09/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less